Marder Limited (issued a business number of 9429030027480) was incorporated on 09 Oct 2013. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 37 Cowan Street, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 (type: physical, registered). Level 2, 24 Johnston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington had been their registered address, until 29 Aug 2022. Marder Limited used more aliases, namely: Indipod Limited from 09 Oct 2013 to 03 Feb 2014. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Horder, Thomas Michael (a director) located at Ponsonby, Auckland postcode 1011,
Horder, Sarah Jane (a director) located at Ponsonby, Auckland postcode 1011. "Business consultant service" (ANZSIC M696205) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Marder Limited. Our data was last updated on 06 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 24 Johnston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6012 | Postal & office & delivery | 21 Aug 2022 |
37 Cowan Street, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 | Physical & registered & service | 29 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomas Michael Horder
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 29 Aug 2021
Kelburn, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 04 Aug 2018
Roseneath, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 04 May 2015 |
Director | 09 Oct 2013 - current |
Sarah Jane Martin
Roseneath, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 04 May 2015 |
Director | 02 Feb 2014 - current |
Sarah Jane Horder
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 29 Aug 2021
Kelburn, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 04 Aug 2018
Roseneath, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 04 May 2015 |
Director | 02 Feb 2014 - current |
1/166 Featherston Street , Wellington Central , Wellington , 6011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 24 Johnston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6012 | Registered & physical | 02 Mar 2021 - 29 Aug 2022 |
34a Rawhiti Terrace, Kelburn, Wellington, 6012 | Physical & registered | 13 Aug 2018 - 02 Mar 2021 |
22 Grass Street, Roseneath, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 24 Aug 2016 - 13 Aug 2018 |
Level 6, 69-71 Boulcott Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 20 Aug 2015 - 24 Aug 2016 |
Level 6, Alan Burns Insurances House, 69-71 Boulcott Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 09 Oct 2013 - 20 Aug 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Horder, Thomas Michael Director |
Ponsonby Auckland 1011 |
09 Oct 2013 - current |
Horder, Sarah Jane Director |
Ponsonby Auckland 1011 |
11 Sep 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Martin, Sarah Jane Individual |
Roseneath Wellington 6011 |
02 Feb 2014 - 11 Sep 2020 |
Sean Rush Law And Policy Limited The Crescent |
|
Ahikouka Holdings Limited 51 The Crescent |
|
Hanuman Shiva Investments Limited 59 The Crescent |
|
I-development Limited 59 The Crescent |
|
Saving Grace Limited 49a The Crescent |
|
Jpg Trustee Limited 76 The Crescent |
Des Coppins Racing & Marketing Limited 1 Grass Street |
Innomarc Consulting Limited 46a Grafton Road |
Humanature Health Limited 338a Oriental Parade |
Synthesis Strategy And Marketing Limited 120 Evans Bay Parade |
Penn Consulting Limited 25 Maida Vale Road |
Bradford And Associates Limited 214 Oriental Parade |