Brocklyn Trading Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429030027794) was started on 11 Oct 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 78A Staveley Street, Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 (type: registered, physical). 10 Millway Place, Huntsbury, Christchurch had been their physical address, up until 04 Apr 2019. 100 shares are issued to 6 shareholders who belong to 6 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Brocks, Amelina Tangud (an individual) located at Avonhead, Christchurch postcode 8042. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 39 per cent of all shares (39 shares); it includes
Lin, Chung Hsuang (an individual) - located at Casebrook, Christchurch. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (53 shares, 53%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Trustees In The R.j. Brocks Family, located at Avonhead, Christchurch (an other). "Meat wholesaling - except canned, cured or smoked poultry or rabbit meat" (ANZSIC F360220) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Brocklyn Trading Limited. Our data was last updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
78a Staveley Street, Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Chung Hsuang Lin
Casebrook, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 11 Oct 2013 |
Director | 11 Oct 2013 - current |
Russell Brocks
Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 30 May 2014 |
Director | 11 Oct 2013 - current |
Terry Lin
Casebrook, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 11 Oct 2013 |
Director | 11 Oct 2013 - current |
Russell John Brocks
Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042
Address used since 27 Mar 2019 |
Director | 11 Oct 2013 - current |
Lertkiat Aschakulporn
Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041
Address used since 11 Oct 2013 |
Director | 11 Oct 2013 - 01 Sep 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
10 Millway Place, Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022 | Physical & registered | 15 Sep 2014 - 04 Apr 2019 |
9 Kauri Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 | Physical & registered | 11 Oct 2013 - 15 Sep 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brocks, Amelina Tangud Individual |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 |
28 Mar 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lin, Chung Hsuang Individual |
Casebrook Christchurch 8051 |
28 Mar 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Trustees In The R.j. Brocks Family Other (Other) |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 |
02 Dec 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brocks, Russell John Individual |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 |
28 Mar 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hee, An Kyung Individual |
Casebrook Christchurch 8051 |
08 Apr 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jeffers, Stephen Raymond Individual |
Rd 11 Poukawa 4178 |
03 Dec 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lin, Terry Director |
Casebrook Christchurch 8051 |
11 Oct 2013 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Aschakulporn, Lertkiat Individual |
Riccarton Christchurch 8041 |
11 Oct 2013 - 29 Oct 2014 |
Chan, Clifford Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8041 |
11 Oct 2013 - 08 Apr 2014 |
Brocks, Russell Director |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 |
11 Oct 2013 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Brocks, Amelia Tangud Individual |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 |
27 Mar 2019 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Lertkiat Aschakulporn Director |
Riccarton Christchurch 8041 |
11 Oct 2013 - 29 Oct 2014 |
Lim, Phaik Luan Individual |
Huntsbury Christchurch 8022 |
11 Oct 2013 - 30 Nov 2015 |
Hogg Tile Limited 7 Millway Pl |
|
The Cranmer Bridge Club Incorporated 1 Millway Place |
|
Fertigation Systems Limited 3 Runswick Lane |
|
The Nkhoma Charitable Trust 4 Eridge Place |
|
Direct Line Resources Limited 12 Swanton Drive |
|
Ritro-vato Investments Limited 12 Swanton Drive |
Ahuriri Farm Limited Level 1, 149 Victoria Street |
Wash Creek Organic Meats Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
Shine's Group International Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
Mr Wycola Chicken Company Limited 9 Prairie Place |
Meat & Fish Direct Limited 79 Jubilee Road |
Enxin Trading Limited 88 Normandale Road |