Dove Business Services Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429030055841) was started on 17 Sep 2013. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 162 Cambridge Road, Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216 (type: registered, physical). 3 Horizon Place, Flagstaff, Hamilton had been their registered address, until 15 Nov 2022. Dove Business Services Limited used other aliases, namely: Dove Building Services Limited from 17 Sep 2013 to 18 May 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 99 shares (99 per cent of shares), namely:
Tim Dove Family Trust (an other) located at Hillcrest, Hamilton postcode 3216. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Dove, Timothy Michael (a director) - located at Hillcrest, Hamilton. "Claim assessment service" (ANZSIC K642020) is the category the ABS issued Dove Business Services Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
162 Cambridge Road, Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Nov 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Timothy Michael Dove
Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216
Address used since 07 Nov 2022
Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 07 Oct 2020
Rd 4, Hamilton, 3284
Address used since 14 Sep 2015
Glenview, Hamilton, 3206
Address used since 10 Oct 2018 |
Director | 17 Sep 2013 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3 Horizon Place, Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210 | Registered & physical | 15 Oct 2020 - 15 Nov 2022 |
56 Glenview Terrace, Glenview, Hamilton, 3206 | Registered & physical | 30 Apr 2018 - 15 Oct 2020 |
89a Fuchsia Lane, Rd 4, Hamilton, 3284 | Physical & registered | 01 Nov 2017 - 30 Apr 2018 |
70 Albert Park Drive, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 | Physical & registered | 17 Sep 2013 - 01 Nov 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tim Dove Family Trust Other (Other) |
Hillcrest Hamilton 3216 |
30 Oct 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dove, Timothy Michael Director |
Hillcrest Hamilton 3216 |
17 Sep 2013 - current |
Generation Stopping Limited 8 Wanaka Place |
|
The Reformed Churches Of New Zealand Emeritus Fund C/o W C Weeda |
|
Little Tikes Limited Chartered Accountants |
|
G.r.ace Software Limited 4 Greta Street |
|
Tasmex Ant Labs Limited 252 Ohaupo Road |
|
Thunderbird Holdings Limited 252 Ohaupo Road |
Bowerman Investigations And Security 1987 Limited 98 Kensington Road |
Jhd Investments Limited 32 Eaton Crescent |
Oughton Consultants Limited 24a Pillans Road |
E S Lawless Limited 6 Kilmacrennan Drive |
Callander Automotive Limited Level 1 |
Uniway Computer Assessments Limited 84 Carnoustie Drive |