No Child Left Inside Limited (NZBN 9429030071117) was registered on 05 Sep 2013. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 34 Jessie Street, Mapua, Mapua, 7005 (type: office, delivery). 16 Dorset Street, Richmond, Richmond had been their physical address, up until 10 Sep 2018. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 75 shares (75% of shares), namely:
Neal, Susan (a director) located at Mapua, Mapua postcode 7005. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25% of all shares (exactly 25 shares); it includes
Thomas, Sally (a director) - located at Nelson South, Nelson. "Sports and physical recreation instruction nec" (business classification P821109) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to No Child Left Inside Limited. Our database was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
34 Jessie Street, Mapua, Mapua, 7005 | Physical & service & registered | 10 Sep 2018 |
34 Jessie Street, Mapua, Mapua, 7005 | Office & delivery & postal | 10 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Susan Neal
Mapua, Mapua, 7005
Address used since 04 Jul 2018 |
Director | 04 Jul 2018 - current |
Sally Thomas
Nelson South, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 11 Sep 2018 |
Director | 11 Sep 2018 - current |
Pogo Alison Paterson Mccauley
Rd 1, Brightwater, 7091
Address used since 16 Aug 2019 |
Director | 16 Aug 2019 - current |
Nathan Faavae
Tasman, Upper Moutere, 7173
Address used since 04 Aug 2015 |
Director | 22 Oct 2013 - 15 Aug 2019 |
Matt Watson
Richmond, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 05 Sep 2013 |
Director | 05 Sep 2013 - 31 Aug 2018 |
34 Jessie Street , Mapua , Mapua , 7005 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
16 Dorset Street, Richmond, Richmond, 7020 | Physical & registered | 05 Sep 2013 - 10 Sep 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Neal, Susan Director |
Mapua Mapua 7005 |
31 Aug 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomas, Sally Director |
Nelson South Nelson 7010 |
16 Aug 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Faavae, Nathan Individual |
Tasman Upper Moutere 7173 |
23 Oct 2013 - 16 Aug 2019 |
Watson, Matt Individual |
Richmond Richmond 7020 |
05 Sep 2013 - 31 Aug 2018 |
Nelson Bays Security Limited 9 Dorset Street |
|
Turnable Art Limited 22a Dorset Street |
|
Levin Christian Care Trust C/- Coopers, Solicitors |
|
Lions Club Of Richmond Incorporated C/o Senior Citizens Rooms |
|
Caterade Limited 44 Oxford Street |
|
Moutere Motors Limited 44 Oxford Street |
Just Gym Limited 255 Rutherford Street |
Nelson Kempo Tai Chi School NZ Limited 15 Britannia Heights |
Tai Chi New Zealand Limited 1 York Street |
Bagua New Zealand Limited 1 York Street |
Company 63 Limited 63 Beauchamp Street |
Gloves Boxing Gym Limited 72b Awarua Street |