New Buccaneer Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429030174856) was incorporated on 19 Jun 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 20 Beaumont Street,, Freemans Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 21 Jul 2014. 10000 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 3000 shares (30% of shares), namely:
Margan, Shaun Ian (a director) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Margan, Ian Noel (a director) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20% of all shares (2000 shares); it includes
Sorrell, Graham Mcdougall (a director) - located at Herne Bay, Auckland. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (2000 shares, 20%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Windansea Investments Limited, located at Grey Lynn, Auckland (an entity). Our information was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Jul 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Louis Smit
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 12 Dec 2016 |
Director | 19 Jun 2013 - current |
Graham Mcdougall Sorrell
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 05 Jun 2014 |
Director | 05 Jun 2014 - current |
Ian Noel Margan
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 05 Jun 2014 |
Director | 05 Jun 2014 - current |
Shaun Ian Margan
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 05 Jun 2014 |
Director | 05 Jun 2014 - current |
Ross Francis Munro
Saint Marys Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 05 Jun 2014 |
Director | 05 Jun 2014 - 07 Aug 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 20 Beaumont Street,, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Registered & physical | 16 Sep 2013 - 21 Jul 2014 |
151 Wellington Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Registered & physical | 19 Jun 2013 - 16 Sep 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Margan, Shaun Ian Director |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
17 Jun 2014 - current |
Margan, Ian Noel Director |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
17 Jun 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sorrell, Graham Mcdougall Director |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
17 Jun 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Windansea Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040392165 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
17 Jun 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smit, Paul Louis Director |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
17 Jun 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Horne, Marilyn Anne Individual |
Saint Marys Bay Auckland 1011 |
17 Jun 2014 - 12 Aug 2015 |
Munro, Ross Francis Individual |
Saint Marys Bay Auckland 1011 |
17 Jun 2014 - 12 Aug 2015 |
F H Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037234775 Company Number: 1040994 Entity |
19 Jun 2013 - 17 Jun 2014 | |
Mcdonald, Kevin Patrick Individual |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
17 Jun 2014 - 12 Aug 2015 |
F H Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037234775 Company Number: 1040994 Entity |
19 Jun 2013 - 17 Jun 2014 | |
Ross Francis Munro Director |
Saint Marys Bay Auckland 1011 |
17 Jun 2014 - 12 Aug 2015 |
Hydroflow Distributors Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Baumatic Appliances Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Irontide Marine Contracting Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Construction Project Management Consultancy Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Streets Ahead Property Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Jones Family Investments Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |