Kilbroney Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030203921) was incorporated on 27 Jun 2013. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 344 Hundred Line Road Eas, Rd 3, Winton, 9783 (type: physical, registered). 73 Clearwater Road, Rd 11, Invercargill had been their registered address, until 16 Jun 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Savage, Bronagh Elizabeth (a director) located at South Hillend, Invercargill postcode 9783,
Warren, James John (a director) located at South Hillend, Invercargill postcode 9783. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Savage, Bronagh Elizabeth (a director) - located at South Hillend, Invercargill. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Warren, James John, located at South Hillend, Invercargill (a director). "Dairy cattle farming" (ANZSIC A016010) is the category the ABS issued to Kilbroney Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
73 Clearwater Road, Rd 11, Invercargill, 9877 | Postal & office & delivery | 02 Sep 2020 |
344 Hundred Line Road Eas, Rd 3, Winton, 9783 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Jun 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bronagh Elizabeth Savage
Rd 3, Winton, 9783
Address used since 21 May 2022
Rd3, Winton, 9783
Address used since 08 Jun 2021
South Hillend, Winton, 9783
Address used since 29 Apr 2015 |
Director | 27 Jun 2013 - current |
James John Warren
Rd 3, Winton, 9783
Address used since 21 May 2022
Rd 11, Invercargill, 9877
Address used since 02 Sep 2020
South Hillend, Winton, 9783
Address used since 29 Apr 2015
Rd 6, Invercargill, 9876
Address used since 17 Apr 2017 |
Director | 27 Jun 2013 - current |
Bronagh Elizabeth Warren
Rd 11, Invercargill, 9877
Address used since 02 Sep 2020
Rd 6, Invercargill, 9876
Address used since 17 Apr 2017 |
Director | 27 Jun 2013 - current |
73 Clearwater Road , Rd 11 , Invercargill , 9877 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
73 Clearwater Road, Rd 11, Invercargill, 9877 | Registered & physical | 10 Sep 2020 - 16 Jun 2021 |
801 Makarewa Browns Road, Rd 6, Invercargill, 9876 | Registered & physical | 26 Apr 2017 - 10 Sep 2020 |
580 Hundred Line Road, South Hillend, Winton, 9783 | Physical & registered | 07 May 2015 - 26 Apr 2017 |
78 Mcneece Road, Ryal Bush, Rd6, Invercargill, 9876 | Registered & physical | 27 Jun 2013 - 07 May 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Savage, Bronagh Elizabeth Director |
South Hillend Invercargill 9783 |
27 Jun 2013 - current |
Warren, James John Director |
South Hillend Invercargill 9783 |
27 Jun 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Savage, Bronagh Elizabeth Director |
South Hillend Invercargill 9783 |
27 Jun 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Warren, James John Director |
South Hillend Invercargill 9783 |
27 Jun 2013 - current |
Weller Holdings Limited 69 Blakie Road |
|
Palantiri Limited 141 Collinson Road |
Agri Trading Limited Level 1 162 Dee St |
Bryn-y-mor Farms Limited Level 1, 20 Don Street |
Elmsmoor Farming Limited Level 1, 20 Don Street |
C J & C J Mckenzie Limited 85 Gala Street |
Country Road Dairies Limited 85 Gala Street |
J & R Ferguson Limited 162 Dee Street |