Summerset Villages (Lower Hutt) Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429030254466) was launched on 22 Apr 2013. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Level 27 Majestic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 (type: delivery, office). Level 20 Majestic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington had been their physical address, until 19 Apr 2017. 10000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 10000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Summerset Holdings Limited (an entity) located at 100 Willis Street, Wellington postcode 6011. Our database was last updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 27 Majestic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Apr 2017 |
Level 27 Majestic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Delivery & office | 18 May 2020 |
P O Box 5187, Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6145 | Postal | 18 May 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Scott Grady Scoullar
Rd 1, Porirua, 5381
Address used since 17 Feb 2023
Whitby, Porirua, 5024
Address used since 04 Apr 2014 |
Director | 04 Apr 2014 - current |
Aaron David Smail
Rd 2, Cromwell, 9384
Address used since 20 Feb 2024
Rd 2, Cromwell, 9384
Address used since 04 Jul 2022
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 21 Feb 2019 |
Director | 21 Feb 2019 - current |
Robyn Heyman
Alicetown, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 17 Feb 2023
Fairfield, Lower Hutt, 5011
Address used since 02 May 2022
Petone, Lower Hutt, 5012
Address used since 17 Jul 2019 |
Director | 17 Jul 2019 - current |
William George Graeme Wright
Seatoun, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 02 May 2022
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 20 Sep 2021 |
Director | 20 Sep 2021 - current |
Sarah Lorraine Theodore
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1062
Address used since 14 Nov 2023
Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 17 Feb 2023 |
Director | 17 Feb 2023 - current |
Dean James Tallentire
Milford, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 04 May 2023 |
Director | 04 May 2023 - current |
Tania Maree Smith
Khandallah, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 01 Feb 2021 |
Director | 01 Feb 2021 - 23 Mar 2022 |
Julian Bradwell Cook
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 19 Feb 2018
Wilton, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 22 Apr 2013 |
Director | 22 Apr 2013 - 22 Mar 2021 |
Leanne Katherine Walker
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 14 Aug 2015 |
Director | 12 Aug 2015 - 16 Aug 2019 |
Paul Stanley Morris
Khandallah, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 14 Aug 2015 |
Director | 22 Apr 2013 - 21 Feb 2019 |
Tristan James Saunders
Roseneath, Wellington As Alternate For Julian Cook, 6011
Address used since 02 May 2014 |
Director | 22 Apr 2013 - 30 Jun 2015 |
Norah Kathleen Barlow
30 Allen Street, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 22 Apr 2013 |
Director | 22 Apr 2013 - 04 Apr 2014 |
Level 27 Majestic Centre , 100 Willis Street , Wellington , 6011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 20 Majestic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 04 Feb 2016 - 19 Apr 2017 |
Level 12, State Insurance Tower, 1 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 22 Apr 2013 - 04 Feb 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Summerset Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037358495 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
100 Willis Street Wellington 6011 |
22 Apr 2013 - current |
Name | Summerset Group Holdings Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1564271 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 27 Majestic Centre 100 Willis Street, Wellington 6011 |
Summerset Villages (ellerslie) Limited Level 27 Majestic Centre |
|
Summerset Villages (hobsonville) Limited Level 27 Majestic Centre |
|
Summerset Lti Trustee Limited Level 27 Majestic Centre |
|
Summerset Villages (nelson) Limited Level 27 Majestic Centre |
|
Summerset Villages (warkworth) Limited Level 27 Majestic Centre |
|
Summerset Holdings Limited Level 27 Majestic Centre |