Art Cafe Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030275935) was registered on 10 Apr 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 72 Buller Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4312 (type: registered, physical). 67 Vivian Street, New Plymouth had been their physical address, up until 12 Dec 2018. 120 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 120 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Jones, Leanne Patricia (an individual) located at New Plymouth, New Plymouth postcode 4312. "Cafe operation" (ANZSIC H451110) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Art Cafe Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
72 Buller Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4312 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Dec 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Leanne Patricia Jones
New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 01 Apr 2017 |
Director | 01 Apr 2017 - current |
Sally Johnson
Rd 2, New Plymouth, 4372
Address used since 10 Apr 2013 |
Director | 10 Apr 2013 - 03 Aug 2018 |
Lois Sharon Gibbins
Rd 7, Inglewood, 4387
Address used since 10 Apr 2013 |
Director | 10 Apr 2013 - 01 Apr 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
67 Vivian Street, New Plymouth, 4310 | Physical & registered | 25 Oct 2016 - 12 Dec 2018 |
7 Liardet Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 | Registered & physical | 10 Apr 2013 - 25 Oct 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Leanne Patricia Individual |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4312 |
07 Apr 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gibbins, Lois Sharon Individual |
Rd 7 Inglewood 4387 |
10 Apr 2013 - 07 Apr 2017 |
Lois Sharon Gibbins Director |
Rd 7 Inglewood 4387 |
10 Apr 2013 - 07 Apr 2017 |
Johnson, Sally Individual |
Rd 2 New Plymouth 4372 |
10 Apr 2013 - 03 Aug 2018 |
L Conaglen Trustees Limited 67 Vivian Street |
|
Tkm Enterprises Limited 67 Vivian Street |
|
Bristeal Trustee Limited 67 Vivian Street |
|
Naylor Holdings Limited 67 Vivian Street |
|
Link Engineering & Manufacturing Limited 67 Vivian Street |
|
M & L Reed Trustee Limited 67 Vivian Street |
Te Kiinaki I A Tako Limited Level 3 |
3starz Limited 23 Walsh Road |
Kea Kaka Limited 141 Powderham Street |
Ozone Coffee Holdings Limited 47 King Street |
Eltv Limited 11 Gover Street |
D & A Trading (2014) Limited 557 Devon Street |