Sr Waikato Trustee (2013) Limited (issued a business number of 9429030291478) was registered on 11 Apr 2013. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Level 3, Building E, Union Square, 192 Anglesea Street, Hamilton, 3204 (type: registered, service). Level 4, B N Z Building, 354 Victoria Street, Hamilton had been their registered address, up to 10 Jul 2019. 5 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1 share (20% of shares), namely:
Dryden, Angela Diane (a director) located at Flagstaff, Hamilton postcode 3210. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Heald, David John (a director) - located at Hamilton. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 20%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Barrett, Craig Mathew, located at Claudelands, Hamilton (a director). "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the classification the ABS issued to Sr Waikato Trustee (2013) Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, B N Z Building, 354 Victoria Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical & service | 10 Jul 2019 |
Level 3, Building E, Union Square, 192 Anglesea Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & service | 07 Mar 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David John Heald
Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 26 Nov 2020
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 11 Apr 2013 |
Director | 11 Apr 2013 - current |
Richard John Williams
Huntington, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 11 Apr 2013 |
Director | 11 Apr 2013 - current |
Craig Mathew Barrett
Claudelands, Hamilton, 3214
Address used since 05 Jun 2015 |
Director | 11 Apr 2013 - current |
Stephanus Johannus Vollebregt
Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 01 Feb 2018 |
Director | 01 Feb 2018 - current |
Angela Diane Dryden
Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 01 Feb 2022 |
Director | 01 Feb 2022 - current |
Gavin Singh Ghuman
Ohaupo, 3883
Address used since 01 Oct 2022
Rd 2, Te Awamutu, 3872
Address used since 01 Feb 2018 |
Director | 01 Feb 2018 - 31 Jan 2023 |
Sharyn Lucille Bell
Lake Okareka Rd5, Rotorua, 3076
Address used since 01 Sep 2020
Fairfield, Hamilton, 3214
Address used since 11 Apr 2013 |
Director | 11 Apr 2013 - 31 Jan 2022 |
Rosanna Marie Baird
Queenwood, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 11 Apr 2013 |
Director | 11 Apr 2013 - 31 Jan 2018 |
Rodney Ian Mckenzie
Morrinsville, 3300
Address used since 11 Apr 2013 |
Director | 11 Apr 2013 - 09 May 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 4, B N Z Building, 354 Victoria Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical | 11 Apr 2013 - 10 Jul 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dryden, Angela Diane Director |
Flagstaff Hamilton 3210 |
03 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heald, David John Director |
Hamilton 3283 |
11 Apr 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barrett, Craig Mathew Director |
Claudelands Hamilton 3214 |
11 Apr 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Vollebregt, Stephanus Johannus Director |
Flagstaff Hamilton 3210 |
24 Apr 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Williams, Richard John Director |
Huntington Hamilton 3210 |
11 Apr 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bell, Sharyn Lucille Individual |
Lake Okareka R.d.5 Rotorua 3076 |
11 Apr 2013 - 03 Feb 2022 |
Ghuman, Gavin Singh Individual |
Ohaupo 3883 |
24 Apr 2018 - 31 Jan 2023 |
Baird, Rosanna Marie Individual |
Queenwood Hamilton 3210 |
11 Apr 2013 - 24 Apr 2018 |
Rodney Ian Mckenzie Director |
Morrinsville 3300 |
11 Apr 2013 - 10 Jul 2014 |
Mckenzie, Rodney Ian Individual |
Morrinsville 3300 |
11 Apr 2013 - 10 Jul 2014 |
Rosanna Marie Baird Director |
Queenwood Hamilton 3210 |
11 Apr 2013 - 24 Apr 2018 |
Bzpay Trading NZ Limited 354 Victoria Street |
|
Performance Panel & Paint 2013 Limited Level 4, B N Z Building |
|
Itn Limited 354 Victoria Street |
|
Revolution Contracting Limited Level 4, Bnz Building |
|
Bzbank Limited 354 Victoria Street |
|
Quikpay New Zealand Limited Level 4, B N Z Building |
Tompkins Wake Trustees 2013 Limited Tompkins Wake, 430 Victoria Street |
Tompkins Wake Trustees 2007 Limited Tompkins Wake |
Pukeko Park Trust Limited Tompkins Wake |
Tompkins Wake Trustees Limited Tompkins Wake |
Tompkins Wake Trustees Brookview Limited 430 Victoria Street |
Tompkins Wake Trustees 2012 Limited 430 Victoria Street |