Javelin Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429030305397) was started on 15 Mar 2013. 7 addresess are in use by the company: 21 Nixon Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (type: office, delivery). 6A Pacific Rise, Mount Wellington, Auckland had been their physical address, until 28 Oct 2021. 158741838 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 158741838 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Acn 649 022 640 - Javln Holdings Limited (an other) located at Sydney Nsw postcode 2000. "J542010 Computer software publishing" (ANZSIC J542010) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Javelin Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6a Pacific Rise, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Office & delivery | 19 Oct 2021 |
Po Box 6300, Wellesley Street, Auckland, 1141 | Postal | 19 Oct 2021 |
21 Nixon Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical & service | 28 Oct 2021 |
21 Nixon Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Office & delivery | 03 Apr 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dale Jonathan Smith
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 15 Mar 2013 |
Director | 15 Mar 2013 - current |
Kerry Grant Mcintosh
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 14 Jul 2022 |
Director | 14 Jul 2022 - current |
Debra Hall
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 15 Nov 2022 |
Director | 15 Nov 2022 - current |
Blair Daniel Wolfgram
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 15 Nov 2022 |
Director | 15 Nov 2022 - current |
Blair Daniel Wolfgram
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 27 Jul 2020 |
Director | 27 Jul 2020 - 14 Jul 2022 |
Craig Thomas Grammer
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 27 Jul 2020 |
Director | 27 Jul 2020 - 14 Jul 2022 |
Ian Cliffe Mosheim
Albany, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 27 Jul 2020 |
Director | 27 Jul 2020 - 14 Jul 2022 |
Debra Hall
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 27 Jul 2020 |
Director | 27 Jul 2020 - 14 Jul 2022 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
21 Nixon Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Office & delivery | 03 Apr 2024 |
6a Pacific Rise , Mount Wellington , Auckland , 1060 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
6a Pacific Rise, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Physical & registered | 10 Oct 2018 - 28 Oct 2021 |
5a Pacific Rise, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Registered & physical | 12 Oct 2016 - 10 Oct 2018 |
5a Pacific Rise, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Registered & physical | 15 Mar 2013 - 12 Oct 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Acn 649 022 640 - Javln Holdings Limited Other (Other) |
Sydney Nsw 2000 |
15 Jul 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burton, Laura Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Wyborn, Justin Individual |
Auckland 1142 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Wolfgram, Blair Daniel Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Apr 2019 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Wolfgram, Blair Daniel Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Apr 2019 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Goodson And Perron Independent Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030734876 Company Number: 3759802 Entity |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 | |
Dufaur Investment Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429045856365 Company Number: 6186212 Entity |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 | |
Bot The Builder Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042565604 Company Number: 6105247 Entity |
13 Aug 2021 - 15 Jul 2022 | |
Wolfgram, Anita Devi Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Apr 2019 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Dasent, Anthony Mark Individual |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 |
26 Aug 2014 - 02 Apr 2015 |
Whisky Securities Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035889908 Company Number: 1346257 Entity |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 | |
Webster Mcneill Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037919122 Company Number: 893649 Entity |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 | |
Insight Assets Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031736138 Company Number: 2373780 Entity |
Mount Wellington Auckland Null 1060 |
26 Aug 2014 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Swainson Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030902664 Company Number: 3623251 Entity |
26 Aug 2014 - 02 Apr 2015 | |
Insight Assets Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031736138 Company Number: 2373780 Entity |
Mount Wellington Auckland Null 1060 |
26 Aug 2014 - 15 Jul 2022 |
18 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035572473 Company Number: 1477111 Entity |
12 Jul 2022 - 15 Jul 2022 | |
Reed, Roie Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Whisky Securities Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035889908 Company Number: 1346257 Entity |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Smith, Wendy Individual |
Te Atatu Peninsula Auckland 0610 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Webster Mcneill Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037919122 Company Number: 893649 Entity |
Ponsonby Auckland |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Greenway, Sarah Individual |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Heywood Taylor, Richard Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Russell, Michael Individual |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Mckeown, Megan Individual |
Stonefields Auckland 1072 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Goodson, Matthew Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Lindsay, Mark Individual |
Rd 6 Point Wells 0986 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Wolland, Leroy Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Bolland, John Individual |
Auckland 1142 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Greenway, James Individual |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Greenway, James Individual |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Insight Assets Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031736138 Company Number: 2373780 Entity |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
26 Aug 2014 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Insight Assets Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031736138 Company Number: 2373780 Entity |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
26 Aug 2014 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Insight Assets Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031736138 Company Number: 2373780 Entity |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
26 Aug 2014 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Warby, Haylee Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Goodson And Perron Independent Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030734876 Company Number: 3759802 Entity |
217 Great South Road, Greenlane Auckland 1051 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Smith, Geoff Individual |
Te Atatu Peninsula Auckland 0610 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Heywood Taylor, Elliott Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
07 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Warby, Dwayne Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Dufaur Investment Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429045856365 Company Number: 6186212 Entity |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Perron, Dianna Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Mckeown, Cameron Individual |
Stonefields Auckland 1072 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Tracey, Bryan Individual |
Warkworth 0994 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Johnston, Bradley Individual |
Orakei Auckland 1071 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Bot The Builder Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042565604 Company Number: 6105247 Entity |
Houghton Bay Wellington 6023 |
13 Aug 2021 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Wolfgram, Anita Devi Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Apr 2019 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Reed, Andrew Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
05 Feb 2020 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Houghton, Alexander Ernest Individual |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
12 Apr 2019 - 15 Jul 2022 |
Houghton, Alexander Ernest Individual |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
12 Apr 2019 - 15 Jul 2022 |
18 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035572473 Company Number: 1477111 Entity |
12 Jul 2022 - 15 Jul 2022 | |
Wolfgram, Blair Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
05 Feb 2020 - 07 Feb 2020 |
Smith, Dale Jonathan Director |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
26 Aug 2014 - 12 Apr 2019 |
Brightside Investments 2010 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031449113 Company Number: 3037005 Entity |
26 Aug 2014 - 02 Apr 2015 | |
Heywood Taylor, Elliot Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
05 Feb 2020 - 07 Feb 2020 |
Houghton, Alex Individual |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
05 Feb 2020 - 07 Feb 2020 |
Swainson, Kevin George Individual |
Schnapper Rock Auckland 0632 |
26 Aug 2014 - 02 Apr 2015 |
Smith, Dale Jonathan Director |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
26 Aug 2014 - 12 Apr 2019 |
Kmd Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031745208 Company Number: 2369653 Entity |
15 Mar 2013 - 26 Aug 2014 | |
Kmd Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031745208 Company Number: 2369653 Entity |
15 Mar 2013 - 26 Aug 2014 | |
Swainson Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030902664 Company Number: 3623251 Entity |
26 Aug 2014 - 02 Apr 2015 | |
Brightside Investments 2010 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031449113 Company Number: 3037005 Entity |
26 Aug 2014 - 02 Apr 2015 |
Name | Insight Assets Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 2373780 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
5a Pacific Rise Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
Line Launcher Holdings Limited 5a Pacific Rise |
|
Amway Of New Zealand 6 A Pacific Rise |
|
Smc Corporation (nz) Limited 5 Pacific Rise |
|
Prime Asset Trust Limited 6b Pacific Rise |
|
Geneva Nominees Limited 6b Pacific Rise |
|
Geneva Financial Services Limited 6b Pacific Rise |
Rieu Limited Unit 3a 517 Mt Wellington Highway |
Enabling Ip Limited 15b Vestey Drive |
Meeca Limited 184 Station Road |
Xtracta Limited Level 6,45 O'rorke Road |
Agility Cis International Limited Level 10, Agility Cis Tower |
Dynanet It Services Limited Level 3, Building 10, Suite 8 |