Terry Trawling Company Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030355583) was started on 22 Feb 2013. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 36 Kaimata Road, Bay View, Napier, 4182 (type: postal, office). 7 Main Street, Hospital Hill, Napier had been their physical address, up to 25 Nov 2015. Terry Trawling Company Limited used other aliases, namely: Mike Terry Plumbing Limited from 07 Feb 2013 to 17 Nov 2015. 100 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1 share (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Terry, Donald Francis (an individual) located at Hospital Hill, Napier postcode 4110. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 49 per cent of all shares (49 shares); it includes
Terry, Michael Oliver (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Napier. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (49 shares, 49%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Terry, Judith Anne, located at Rd 2, Napier (an individual). "Line fishing" (ANZSIC A041320) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Terry Trawling Company Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
36 Kaimata Road, Bay View, Napier, 4182 | Registered & physical & service | 25 Nov 2015 |
36 Kaimata Road, Bay View, Napier, 4182 | Postal & office & delivery | 21 Oct 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Oliver Terry
Bay View, Napier, 4182
Address used since 17 Nov 2015 |
Director | 17 Nov 2015 - current |
Judith Anne Terry
Bay View, Napier, 4182
Address used since 17 Nov 2015 |
Director | 17 Nov 2015 - 20 Jul 2016 |
Michael Ramsey Terry
Hospital Hill, Napier, 4110
Address used since 22 Feb 2013 |
Director | 22 Feb 2013 - 17 Nov 2015 |
36 Kaimata Road , Bay View , Napier , 4182 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7 Main Street, Hospital Hill, Napier, 4110 | Physical & registered | 22 Feb 2013 - 25 Nov 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Terry, Donald Francis Individual |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
20 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Terry, Michael Oliver Individual |
Rd 2 Napier 4182 |
22 Feb 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Terry, Judith Anne Individual |
Rd 2 Napier 4182 |
22 Feb 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Terry, Michael Ramsey Individual |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
20 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Terry, Michael Ramsey Individual |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
22 Feb 2013 - 16 Nov 2015 |
Kean, Gavin Peter Individual |
Tamatea Napier 4112 |
22 Feb 2013 - 16 Nov 2015 |
Andrea Murphy Architectural Design Limited 42 Kaimata Road |
|
Waimakuku Whanau Trust State Highway 5 |
|
Apex Building Contractors Limited 44 Kaimata Road |
|
Ott Trustee Limited 28 Kaimata Road |
|
Taste Of Brazil By Lisa Limited 890 Main North Road |
|
Isobel James Limited 77 Eskdale Drive |
Profit On Point Limited 15 Coverdale Street |
Ruamano Fishing Limited Nga Wai E Rua Building |
Fifty South Fishing Company Limited 49 Boscabel Drive |
Kawhia & Raglan Flounder Limited 91 Clarence Street |
Tierney Partnership Limited 88 Pope St |
Early Bird Bait & Tackle, Fishing & Hunting, Limited 316 Ngati Maru Highway |