Mj Brown Nominees Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429030366558) was started on 29 Jan 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 67 High Street, Hawera, 4610 (type: physical, registered). 10 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 10 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Htl Nominees Limited (an entity) located at Hawera, Hawera postcode 4610. The Businesscheck data was updated on 31 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
67 High Street, Hawera, 4610 | Physical & registered & service | 29 Jan 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Murray Alexander Brown
R D 14, Hawera, 4674
Address used since 02 Aug 2018 |
Director | 02 Aug 2018 - current |
Judith Dawn Brown
R D 14, Hawera, 4674
Address used since 02 Aug 2018 |
Director | 02 Aug 2018 - current |
Melanie Cherie Van Den Brand
R D 28, Hawera, 4678
Address used since 22 Aug 2018 |
Director | 22 Aug 2018 - current |
Andrew Alexander Brown
R D 9, Whangarei, 0179
Address used since 22 Oct 2019 |
Director | 22 Oct 2019 - current |
Geoffrey Nigel Nicholas
R D 14, Hawera, 4674
Address used since 29 Jan 2013 |
Director | 29 Jan 2013 - 02 Aug 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Htl Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051231149 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hawera Hawera 4610 |
01 May 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pratt, Dean Michael Individual |
Hawera Hawera 4610 |
19 Jan 2021 - 01 May 2023 |
Nicholas, Geoffrey Nigel Individual |
R D 14 Hawera 4674 |
29 Jan 2013 - 19 Jan 2021 |
Wallis Cameron Developments Limited 67 High Street |
|
Lomas Nominees Limited 67 High Street |
|
D & C Hughes Trustee Limited 67 High Street |
|
Lrc Investments Limited 67 High Street |
|
Dwyer Farms Limited 67 High Street |
|
C A Dwyer Nominees Limited 67 High Street |