Julian Haszard Trustee Company Limited (NZBN 9429030402881) was launched on 17 Dec 2012. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 46 King Street, New Plymouth, 4640 (type: office, registered). 46 King Street, New Plymouth had been their registered address, up until 02 Oct 2020. 10 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 10 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Young + Carrington Trustees (2016) Limited (an entity) located at New Plymouth, New Plymouth postcode 4310. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the category the ABS issued to Julian Haszard Trustee Company Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
46 King Street, New Plymouth, 4640 | Office | unknown |
318 St Aubyn Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 | Registered & physical & service | 02 Oct 2020 |
79 Vivian Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 | Registered & service | 25 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Christopher Patrick Ussher
Westown, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 22 Mar 2018 |
Director | 22 Mar 2018 - current |
Paul Robert Franklin
New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 31 Aug 2016 |
Director | 17 Dec 2012 - 22 Mar 2018 |
Geoffrey Keenan Shearer
Rd 6, Inglewood, 4386
Address used since 17 Dec 2012 |
Director | 17 Dec 2012 - 22 Mar 2018 |
Paul Francis Anderson
New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 12 May 2016 |
Director | 17 Dec 2012 - 22 Mar 2018 |
Alice Marie Tocher
Rd 7, Inglewood, 4387
Address used since 03 Aug 2017 |
Director | 10 Sep 2015 - 22 Mar 2018 |
Norton Ross Fanthorpe
Rd 4, New Plymouth, 4374
Address used since 17 Dec 2012 |
Director | 17 Dec 2012 - 06 Oct 2017 |
John Heywood Ross Eagles
New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 08 Oct 2013 |
Director | 17 Dec 2012 - 23 Dec 2016 |
46 King Street , New Plymouth , 4640 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
46 King Street, New Plymouth, 4640 | Registered & physical | 05 Oct 2018 - 02 Oct 2020 |
1 Dawson Street, New Plymouth, 4342 | Registered & physical | 17 Dec 2012 - 05 Oct 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Young + Carrington Trustees (2016) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042190110 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 |
06 Apr 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gq Trustee Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031764056 Company Number: 2363036 Entity |
New Plymouth |
17 Dec 2012 - 06 Apr 2018 |
Gq Trustee Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031764056 Company Number: 2363036 Entity |
New Plymouth |
17 Dec 2012 - 06 Apr 2018 |
Cape Farms Limited 1 Dawson Street |
|
Taranaki Cultural Trust C/o Govett Quilliam, The Lawyers |
|
Itaranaki Trust C/o Govett Quilliam |
|
Links Homeowners Society Incorporated C/o Govett Quilliam |
|
Taranaki Families/whanau Centre Trust Board C/o Govett Quilliam |
|
Taranaki Charity Cycle Riders Trust C/o Govett Quilliam |
The Gap Trustee Co. Limited 10 Young Street |
Lw Nominees (2015) Limited 10 Young Street |
Emma Trustees Limited 7 Young Street |
Chris Jensen Trustee Limited 136-138 Powderham Street |
Ql2 Limited 11 Robe Street |
Lovee Trustees Limited 11 Robe Street |