J J Group 2012 Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030460157) was started on 01 Nov 2012. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 106 George Street, Dunedin, 9016 (type: registered, service). 47 Calder Street, Saint Kilda, Dunedin had been their registered address, until 14 May 2024. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Leckie, Jeffrey David (an individual) located at Saint Kilda, Dunedin postcode 9012. "Fitness centre" (ANZSIC R911110) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued J J Group 2012 Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 07 May 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical & service | 30 Aug 2022 |
Level 1, 106 George Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & service | 14 May 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jeffrey David Leckie
Saint Kilda, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 01 Nov 2012 |
Director | 01 Nov 2012 - current |
Jeffery David Leckie
Saint Kilda, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 01 Nov 2012 |
Director | 01 Nov 2012 - current |
Janelle Miskimmin
Rd 1, Dunedin, 9076
Address used since 01 Nov 2012 |
Director | 01 Nov 2012 - 11 Apr 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
47 Calder Street, Saint Kilda, Dunedin, 9012 | Registered & service | 05 Mar 2024 - 14 May 2024 |
Level 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 07 Oct 2020 - 30 Aug 2022 |
7 Gladstone Road, Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 | Registered & physical | 29 Apr 2014 - 07 Oct 2020 |
579 Highcliff Road, Rd 2, Dunedin, 9077 | Physical & registered | 01 Nov 2012 - 29 Apr 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leckie, Jeffrey David Individual |
Saint Kilda Dunedin 9012 |
29 Sep 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Adamson, Jamie Ross Individual |
Halfway Bush Dunedin 9010 |
15 Aug 2014 - 16 Jan 2024 |
Leckie, Jeffery David Director |
Saint Kilda Dunedin 9012 |
01 Nov 2012 - 29 Sep 2020 |
Miskimmin, Janelle Individual |
Rd 1 Dunedin 9076 |
01 Nov 2012 - 16 Apr 2014 |
Janelle Miskimmin Director |
Rd 1 Dunedin 9076 |
01 Nov 2012 - 16 Apr 2014 |
NZ Forest Exports Limited 7 Gladstone Road |
|
Platinum Recruitment Limited 7 Gladstone Road |
|
Lj Contracting Otago Limited 7 Gladstone Road |
|
Aok Trustees Limited 7 Gladstone Road |
|
James Cross Masonry Limited 7 Gladstone Road |
|
Mma Supplies Limited 7 Gladstone Road South |
Valley Strength And Conditioning Limited 292a Kaikorai Valley Road |
Abs Hf Limited 250 King Edward Street |
Elev 8 Global Limited 83 Moray Place |
Sj Fitness (2018) Limited Irvine Road |
Ake Ake Theatre Company Limited 59 Marion Street |
Pro Fit Limited 17-19 John Street |