Beautiful Bicycles Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030499829) was registered on 26 Sep 2012. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 1 Marion St, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 (type: delivery, postal). 5 Riddiford Street, Newtown, Wellington had been their registered address, until 19 Jul 2017. 125000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 94375 shares (75.5% of shares), namely:
Mikkelsen, Daniel Skipper (a director) located at Greytown, Greytown postcode 5712. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20% of all shares (exactly 25000 shares); it includes
Brown, Thomas Neil (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Otaki. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (5625 shares, 4.5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Malpas, Phillip Charles, located at Otaki, Otaki (an individual). "Bicycle and accessory retailing" (ANZSIC G424110) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Beautiful Bicycles Limited. Our database was updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1 Marion Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Jul 2017 |
1 Marion St, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Postal & office | 05 Jun 2019 |
1 Marion St, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Delivery | 08 Jul 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Daniel Skipper Mikkelsen
Greytown, Greytown, 5712
Address used since 11 Oct 2021
Houghton Bay, Wellington, 6023
Address used since 26 Sep 2012 |
Director | 26 Sep 2012 - current |
Richard Brooke Riddell-garner
Melrose, Wellington, 6023
Address used since 26 Sep 2012 |
Director | 26 Sep 2012 - 28 Mar 2013 |
5 Riddiford Street , Newtown , Wellington , 6021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
5 Riddiford Street, Newtown, Wellington, 6021 | Registered | 12 May 2014 - 19 Jul 2017 |
5 Riddiford Street, Newtown, Wellington, 6021 | Physical | 08 May 2014 - 19 Jul 2017 |
5 Riddiford Street, Newtown, Wellington, 6021 | Registered | 09 Apr 2013 - 12 May 2014 |
5 Riddiford Street, Newtown, Wellington, 6021 | Physical | 11 Jan 2013 - 08 May 2014 |
5 Riddiford Street, Newtown, Wellington, 6021 | Registered | 11 Jan 2013 - 09 Apr 2013 |
67 Hornsey Road, Melrose, Wellington, 6023 | Registered & physical | 26 Sep 2012 - 11 Jan 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mikkelsen, Daniel Skipper Director |
Greytown Greytown 5712 |
26 Sep 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brown, Thomas Neil Individual |
Rd 2 Otaki 5582 |
20 Feb 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Malpas, Phillip Charles Individual |
Otaki Otaki 5512 |
26 Nov 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mikkelsen, Solveig Elisabeth Individual |
Masterton Masterton 5810 |
03 Dec 2021 - 09 May 2024 |
Riddell-garner, Richard Brooke Individual |
Melrose Wellington 6023 |
26 Sep 2012 - 28 Mar 2013 |
Richard Brooke Riddell-garner Director |
Melrose Wellington 6023 |
26 Sep 2012 - 28 Mar 2013 |
Foundry Creative Limited Level 2 |
|
The Seyip Association Of New Zealand Incorporated 21-25 Ghuznee Street |
|
N.a. Distributors Limited 9 Marion Street |
|
Wellington Irish Community Trust C/o Egan Ogier Gibbs & Co |
|
Kristina House C/o Atlas Shovel Works (nz) Ltd |
|
The Real Music Company Limited 9-11 Marion Street |
Iride Limited 242 Thorndon Quay |
Muddy Tracks Limited 424 Karori Road |
Velo City Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
Puresports NZ Limited 3 Flotilla Place |
Cycletech New Zealand Limited 19 Portage Place |
Fancy Investments Limited 218 Valley Road |