Habia Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429030513600) was started on 14 Sep 2012. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 6, 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington, 6011 (type: physical, registered). Level 6, 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington had been their registered address, up to 16 Oct 2019. 1000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Blutsbruder Limited (an entity) located at New Plymouth, New Plymouth postcode 4310. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Baker Tilly Staples Rodway Wellington Trustees Limited (an entity) - located at 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington,
Weatherly Trustee Limited (an entity) - located at 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington. "Investment - commercial property" (ANZSIC L671230) is the classification the ABS issued to Habia Limited. Our data was updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 6, 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Oct 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kelvin Eric Hale
Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013
Address used since 29 Jun 2018
Khandallah, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 14 Sep 2012 |
Director | 14 Sep 2012 - current |
Dennis Robert Ebert
Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 29 Jun 2018
Belmont, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 15 Oct 2012 |
Director | 15 Oct 2012 - current |
Ian Holland
Churton Park, Wellington, 6037
Address used since 30 Jan 2015 |
Director | 14 Sep 2012 - 31 Mar 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 6, 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 21 Apr 2017 - 16 Oct 2019 |
4 Wakefield Street, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Physical & registered | 14 Sep 2012 - 21 Apr 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Blutsbruder Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047357006 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 |
01 Sep 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Baker Tilly Staples Rodway Wellington Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047150867 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
95 Customhouse Quay Wellington 6011 |
08 Oct 2019 - current |
Weatherly Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047417144 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
95 Customhouse Quay Wellington 6140 |
08 Oct 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Forsyth, Donald Eric Individual |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
14 Sep 2012 - 08 Oct 2019 |
Finnigan, Michael Chanel Individual |
Hurdon New Plymouth 4310 |
15 Oct 2012 - 01 Sep 2020 |
Ebert, Beatrice Anne Individual |
Belmont Auckland 0622 |
15 Oct 2012 - 01 Sep 2020 |
Hale, Bronwyn Mary Individual |
Khandallah Wellington 6035 |
14 Sep 2012 - 08 Oct 2019 |
Todd Sisson (nz) Limited The Todd Building |
|
Marokopa Drilling Limited The Todd Building |
|
Tsl Methanol Limited The Todd Building |
|
Todd Energy International Limited Level 15, The Todd Building |
|
Nova Energy Limited Level 15, The Todd Building |
|
Tio (nz) Limited The Todd Building |
Provincial Steel Properties Limited Floor 2, 111 Customhouse Quay |
Twinings Property Limited Floor 2, 111 Customhouse Quay |
Wpc Properties Limited Floor 2, 111 Customhouse Quay |
97 The Terrace Limited L1, 1 Victoria Street |
150 Featherston Street Limited L1, 1 Victoria Street |
Foxglove Investments Limited L1, 1 Victoria Street |