Ballymore Stables Nz Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429030548190) was incorporated on 03 Sep 2012. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 17, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, service). Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 14 Aug 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Edmonds Marshall Trustee Services No. 4 Limited (an entity) located at 20 Arawa Street, Matamata 3400,
Moroney, Aliesha-Jane (an individual) located at Rd 1, Tirau postcode 3484. "Horse racing - harness racing" (business classification R912930) is the category the ABS issued Ballymore Stables Nz Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Service & physical | 15 Jul 2014 |
Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 14 Aug 2019 |
Level 8, 139 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 18 Dec 2023 |
Level 17, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 12 Aug 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Moroney
Flemington, Victoria, 3031
Address used since 03 Sep 2012
Melbourne, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Melbourne, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 03 Sep 2012 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 17, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 12 Aug 2024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 15 Jul 2014 - 14 Aug 2019 |
Level 6, 51 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 15 Nov 2013 - 15 Jul 2014 |
3 London Street, City Centre, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical | 03 Sep 2012 - 15 Nov 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Edmonds Marshall Trustee Services No. 4 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032418323 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
20 Arawa Street Matamata 3400 |
03 Sep 2012 - current |
Moroney, Aliesha-jane Individual |
Rd 1 Tirau 3484 |
05 May 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Moroney, Denis Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
03 Sep 2012 - 05 May 2021 |
Moroney, Denis Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
03 Sep 2012 - 05 May 2021 |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |
Cambridge Raceway Limited 1 Taylor Street |
Malabar Lodge Limited 146 Carters Road |
G S Bloodstock Limited 121 Port Road |
Heritage Ventures NZ Limited 8 Rother Street |
Diamond Racing Stables Limited 316 Monument Road |