The Hawkes Bay Motor Company Limited (issued a business number of 9429030548640) was registered on 15 Aug 2012. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 86 Station Street, Napier, 4140 (type: registered, service). 89 Courtenay Place, Te Aro, Wellington had been their registered address, up to 26 Mar 2015. 250000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 250000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
R & M Motors Limited (an entity) located at Napier South, Napier postcode 4110. "Car dealer - new and/or used (including associated vehicle servicing)" (business classification G391110) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to The Hawkes Bay Motor Company Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
57 Courtenay Place, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 26 Mar 2015 |
Po Box 21, Hastings, Hastings, 4156 | Postal | 03 Mar 2020 |
Cnr Heretaunga & Tomoana Road, Hastings, 4156 | Office | 03 Mar 2020 |
86 Station Street, Napier, 4140 | Registered & service | 17 Nov 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Robert Paul Townshend
Taradale, Napier, 4112
Address used since 31 Oct 2022 |
Director | 31 Oct 2022 - current |
Mel Yen Chan
Hospital Hill, Napier, 4110
Address used since 31 Oct 2022 |
Director | 31 Oct 2022 - current |
Alexander Peter Gibbons
Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 01 Oct 2021 |
Director | 01 Oct 2021 - 31 Oct 2022 |
Stuart Barnes Gibbons
Epuni, Lower Hutt, 5011
Address used since 06 Nov 2021 |
Director | 06 Nov 2021 - 31 Oct 2022 |
James Picot Gibbons
Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013
Address used since 15 Aug 2012 |
Director | 15 Aug 2012 - 05 Nov 2021 |
Graeme Durrad Gibbons
Woburn, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 19 Feb 2021
Boulcott, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 15 Aug 2012 |
Director | 15 Aug 2012 - 30 Sep 2021 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
86 Station Street, Napier, 4140 | Registered & service | 17 Nov 2022 |
Cnr Heretaunga & Tomoana Road , Hastings , 4156 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
89 Courtenay Place, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 15 Aug 2012 - 26 Mar 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
R & M Motors Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429044078089 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Napier South Napier 4110 |
08 Nov 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Colonial Motor Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040973531 Company Number: 1193 Entity |
57 Courtenay Place, Wellington 6011 |
15 Aug 2012 - 08 Nov 2022 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | The Colonial Motor Company Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1193 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 6 57 Courtenay Place, Wellington 6011 |
Cmc Motor Group Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
|
Cmc Workplace Savings Scheme Trustee Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
|
Automotive Computer Services Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
|
Agricentre South Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
|
Avon City Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
|
The Motor Company Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
Avon City Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
Energy Motors Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
Southern Autos - Manukau Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
Avon City Motors Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
South Auckland Motors Limited 57 Courtenay Place |
Ruahine Motors Limited 57 Courtenay Place |