Lighting Revolution Limited (issued a business number of 9429030555167) was incorporated on 09 Aug 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (type: physical, service). Unit 11/135 Cryers Road, East Tamaki, Auckland had been their registered address, until 25 Feb 2015. Lighting Revolution Limited used other aliases, namely: Limelight Design Limited from 09 Aug 2012 to 05 Apr 2018. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Fag Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Saint Johns, Auckland postcode 1072. "Design services nec" (ANZSIC M692435) is the classification the ABS issued to Lighting Revolution Limited. Our information was updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Physical & service & registered | 25 Feb 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gabrielle Elizabeth Dickens
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 08 Sep 2016 |
Director | 08 Sep 2016 - current |
Franklin Mark Davis
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 08 Apr 2024 |
Director | 08 Apr 2024 - current |
Andrew William Cunningham
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 08 Apr 2024 |
Director | 08 Apr 2024 - current |
Gabrielle Elizabeth Peace
Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 23 Mar 2021
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 08 Sep 2016 |
Director | 08 Sep 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Andrew William Cunningham
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 06 Mar 2015 |
Director | 06 Mar 2015 - 08 Sep 2016 |
Frank Mark Davis
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 06 Mar 2015 |
Director | 06 Mar 2015 - 08 Sep 2016 |
Gabrielle Elizabeth Dickens
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 01 Nov 2014 |
Director | 09 Aug 2012 - 06 Mar 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 11/135 Cryers Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & physical | 09 Aug 2012 - 25 Feb 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fag Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047771697 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Saint Johns Auckland 1072 |
23 May 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dickens, Gabrielle Elizabeth Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
12 Sep 2016 - 08 Apr 2019 |
Dickens, Gabrielle Elizabeth Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
09 Aug 2012 - 04 Mar 2015 |
Peace, Gabrielle Elizabeth Individual |
Meadowbank Auckland 1072 |
08 Apr 2019 - 23 May 2022 |
Gabrielle Elizabeth Dickens Director |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
09 Aug 2012 - 04 Mar 2015 |
Hunza Lighting International Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033226040 Company Number: 1969788 Entity |
04 Mar 2015 - 12 Sep 2016 | |
Dickens, Gabrielle Elizabeth Director |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
12 Sep 2016 - 08 Apr 2019 |
Hunza Lighting International Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033226040 Company Number: 1969788 Entity |
04 Mar 2015 - 12 Sep 2016 |
R & R Quality Products Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
Flowerpak 2005 Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
Fresh To Go Limited Level 2, 116 Harris Road |
|
Spraggon Marketing Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
NZ Good Food Co. Limited Level 2, Bdo House, 116 Harris Road, |
|
Elite Garage Doors Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
Performance Window Film Solutions Limited Unit 11, 135 Cryers Road |
Mass Limited Suite 6, 2 Armoy Drive |
Klah Creative Limited 27 Swan Crescent |
Angel Discovery International Group Limited 16 Fusion Road |
Pointone Polylink Limited 16 Fusion Road |
Miller International Limited 230 Panama Road |