Kk Trustees Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429030577152) was registered on 24 Jul 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 62 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2014 (type: physical, registered). Level 2,Building 5,60 Highbrook Drive, Highbrook, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 11 Aug 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Kells, Kathryn Mary (a director) located at Papakura, Papakura postcode 2110. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the classification the ABS issued to Kk Trustees Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
62 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2014 | Physical & registered & service | 11 Aug 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kathryn Mary Kells
Papakura, Papakura, 2110
Address used since 24 Jul 2012 |
Director | 24 Jul 2012 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2,building 5,60 Highbrook Drive, Highbrook, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & physical | 13 Aug 2018 - 11 Aug 2021 |
Ford Building,86 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Physical & registered | 12 Aug 2014 - 13 Aug 2018 |
11/465 Mt Eden Rd, Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Physical & registered | 24 Jul 2012 - 12 Aug 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kells, Kathryn Mary Director |
Papakura Papakura 2110 |
24 Jul 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aca Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037706043 Company Number: 936968 Entity |
24 Jul 2012 - 14 Aug 2014 | |
Aca Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037706043 Company Number: 936968 Entity |
24 Jul 2012 - 14 Aug 2014 |
My Tax Back NZ Limited Ford Building |
|
Raymond Abel Dental Limited Ford Building |
|
Sebo Limited Unit 12, 13 Highbrook Drive |
|
Oldco Limited Unit 2, 13 Highbrook Drive |
|
Ford Motor Company Of New Zealand Limited Level 2, The Ford Building |
|
Ftl Securities Limited Level 1 21 El Kobar Drive |
Ftl Securities Limited Level 1 21 El Kobar Drive |
Graham Peet Trustee Company Limited 1/6 Cryers Road |
Peet Trustees Limited 1/6 Cryers Road |
Bct Ballantyne Limited 7th Floor, Southern Cross Building |
Bct Moody Limited 7th Floor, Southern Cross Building |
Bct Jonathan Smith Limited 7th Floor, Southern Cross Building |