Katakiwa Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030608245) was registered on 06 Jul 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 2, 2 Hargreaves Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1011 (type: physical, service). Level 2, 5-7 Kingdon Street, Newmarket, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 24 Jan 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 10 shares (10% of shares), namely:
Trusts Limited (an entity) located at Newmarket, Auckland postcode 1023. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 90% of all shares (exactly 90 shares); it includes
Catana Trustee Limited (an entity) - located at Newmarket, Auckland,
Sullivan, Susan Maree (an individual) - located at West Harbour, Auckland,
Sullivan, Bruce Alan (an individual) - located at West Harbour, Auckland. The Businesscheck data was updated on 06 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 2 Hargreaves Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1011 | Physical & service & registered | 24 Jan 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dennis Raymond Pivac
Aspendale Gardens, Victoria, 3195
Address used since 06 Jul 2012 |
Director | 06 Jul 2012 - current |
Bruce Alan Sullivan
West Harbour, Auckland, 0618
Address used since 17 Nov 2015 |
Director | 17 Nov 2015 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 5-7 Kingdon Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 24 Jun 2015 - 24 Jan 2022 |
Level 4 Bupa House, 5 - 7 Kingdon Street, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 06 Jul 2012 - 24 Jun 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Trusts Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036694082 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
06 Jul 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Catana Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030597679 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
06 Jul 2012 - current |
Sullivan, Susan Maree Individual |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 |
06 Jul 2012 - current |
Sullivan, Bruce Alan Individual |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 |
06 Jul 2012 - current |
Arnott's New Zealand Limited Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent |
|
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Your Property Services Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Grovers Investments Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |