Mr Electri City Limited (NZBN 9429030633254) was registered on 08 Jun 2012. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 26 Hoey Street, Kamo, Whangarei, 0112 (type: postal, postal). 14C Grant Street, Kamo, Whangarei had been their registered address, up to 13 Apr 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Coetzee, Tracey Lee (an individual) located at Kamo, Whangarei postcode 0112. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Coetzee, Jerrie (a director) - located at Kamo, Whangarei. "Electrical services" (business classification E323220) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Mr Electri City Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
26 Hoey Street, Kamo, Whangarei, 0112 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Apr 2016 |
Po Box 4140, Kamo, Whangarei, 0141 | Postal | 18 Jun 2019 |
26 Hoey Street, Kamo, Whangarei, 0112 | Office | 18 Jun 2019 |
26 Hoey Street, Kamo, Whangarei, 0112 | Postal | 06 Jun 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jerrie Coetzee
Kamo, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 14 Mar 2016 |
Director | 08 Jun 2012 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
26 Hoey Street, Kamo, Whangarei, 0112 | Postal | 06 Jun 2024 |
26 Hoey Street , Kamo , Whangarei , 0112 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
14c Grant Street, Kamo, Whangarei, 0112 | Registered | 14 Apr 2014 - 13 Apr 2016 |
14c Grant Street, Kamo, Kamo, 0112 | Physical | 14 Apr 2014 - 13 Apr 2016 |
73 Three Mile Bush Road, Kamo, Kamo, 0112 | Registered & physical | 24 Jun 2013 - 14 Apr 2014 |
77 Pukepoto Road, Kaitaia, Kaitaia, 0410 | Physical & registered | 08 Jun 2012 - 24 Jun 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Coetzee, Tracey Lee Individual |
Kamo Whangarei 0112 |
13 Mar 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Coetzee, Jerrie Director |
Kamo Whangarei 0112 |
08 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Coetzee, Tracey Lee Individual |
Kaitaia Kaitaia 0410 |
08 Jun 2012 - 07 Mar 2013 |
Maintenance North Limited 34 Hoey Street |
|
Mark Thomas Limited 38 Hoey Street |
|
Hydraco Limited 35 Hoey Street |
|
Zoomin Groom Mobile Pet Grooming Limited 3 Cowley Place |
|
Te Roopu Awhina O Whangarei 3 Adams Place |
|
Tikipunga Gospel Trust 13 Lincoln Place |
Bma Electrical Limited 2a Grant Street |
Dempster & Hill Electrical Limited 11a Clark Road |
Cid Electrical Limited 16 Barclay Place |
Eis Limited 258 Whareora Road |
Liddington Electrical Southern Limited 134 Bank Street |
Kevin Trumper Electrical Limited 134 Bank Street |