Stonecraft Nz Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030641679) was incorporated on 01 Jun 2012. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 2 Redan Road, Kaitaia, 0410 (type: registered, service). 1000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 333 shares (33.3% of shares), namely:
Hunter, Jody Neil (an individual) located at R D 1, Kaitaia postcode 0481,
Hunter, Jody Neil (a director) located at R D 1, Kaitaia postcode 0481. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.4% of all shares (exactly 334 shares); it includes
Mitcalfe, Michael Henry Percy (a director) - located at Ahipara, R D 1, Kaitaia. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (333 shares, 33.3%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Blithe, Ross Gordon, located at Victoria Valley, R D 1, Kaitaia (a director). "Landscape construction" (business classification E329140) is the category the ABS issued to Stonecraft Nz Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2 Redan Road, Kaitaia, 0410 | Registered & physical & service | 01 Jun 2012 |
2 Redan Road, Kaitaia, 0410 | Registered & service | 19 Oct 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ross Gordon Blithe
Waipapakauri, Awanui, 0486
Address used since 02 Jun 2012
Victoria Valley, R D 1, Kaitaia, 0481
Address used since 01 Jun 2012 |
Director | 01 Jun 2012 - current |
Michael Henry Percy Mitcalfe
Ahipara, R D 1, Kaitaia, 0481
Address used since 12 Mar 2014 |
Director | 01 Jun 2012 - current |
Jody Neil Hunter
Ahipara, 0481
Address used since 29 Mar 2023 |
Director | 29 Mar 2023 - current |
Jody Neil Hunter
R D 1, Kaitaia, 0481
Address used since 01 Jun 2012 |
Director | 01 Jun 2012 - 22 Mar 2023 |
Gary William Liddicoat
Albany, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 13 Oct 2015 |
Director | 01 Jun 2012 - 20 Sep 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hunter, Jody Neil Individual |
R D 1 Kaitaia 0481 |
01 Jun 2012 - current |
Hunter, Jody Neil Director |
R D 1 Kaitaia 0481 |
01 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mitcalfe, Michael Henry Percy Director |
Ahipara, R D 1 Kaitaia 0481 |
01 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Blithe, Ross Gordon Director |
Victoria Valley, R D 1 Kaitaia 0481 |
01 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Liddicoat, Gary William Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
01 Jun 2012 - 25 Oct 2017 |
Gary William Liddicoat Director |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
01 Jun 2012 - 25 Oct 2017 |
Intuitive Control Limited 2 Redan Road |
|
Subritzky Clark Logging Limited 2 Redan Road |
|
The Alligator Pear Limited 2 Redan Road |
|
Beach Road Farms 1996 Limited 2 Redan Road |
|
Fountain Tree Felling Limited 2 Redan Road |
|
Far North Pharmacy Limited 2 Redan Road |
Buildall Holdings Limited Church Road |
Better Earth Limited 108 Marsden Point Road |
Extremescape Limited 57 Millennium Way |
O'malley Contracting Limited 16 Marshall Road |
Warkworth Landscaping Limited 39 Kaipara Flats Road |
Wyatt Haulage (2004) Limited 371 Woodcocks Road |