Davies Flynn Trustee Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429030649699) was registered on 25 May 2012. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 55 St Annes Crescent, Wattle Downs, Auckland, 2103 (type: service, registered). 12A Jack Conway Avenue, Manukau, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 02 Aug 2022. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Davies, Colin Lionel (a director) located at Wattle Downs, Auckland postcode 2103. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Davies Flynn Trustee Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
301/6-8 Heather Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical & service | 02 Aug 2022 |
55 St Annes Crescent, Wattle Downs, Auckland, 2103 | Service & registered | 28 Jul 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Colin Lionel Davies
Wattle Downs, Auckland, 2103
Address used since 07 Mar 2013 |
Director | 25 May 2012 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
12a Jack Conway Avenue, Manukau, Auckland, 2104 | Registered & physical | 18 Aug 2014 - 02 Aug 2022 |
1/14 Penrose Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1060 | Physical & registered | 25 May 2012 - 18 Aug 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Davies, Colin Lionel Director |
Wattle Downs Auckland 2103 |
25 May 2012 - current |
Cpr Property Maintenance Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
|
Tranquility Service Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
|
Kiwi Oil Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
|
Sportfolio (uk) Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
|
Ronald Young Trustee Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
|
Holistic Holdings NZ Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
My Blue Barn Trustees Limited 12a Jack Conway Ave |
Schollum Trustee Limited 21e Ryan Place |
Southern Legal Trustee Services Limited 611 Great South Road |
Ong Family Trust Limited 3 Osterley Way |
Inlet Trustee Limited 3 Osterley Way |
Lewavesi Trustee Limited 3 Osterley Way |