Verkerk Dairying Limited (issued a business number of 9429030672482) was registered on 21 May 2012. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 123 Vogel Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: registered, service). 110 Vogel Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin had been their registered address, up until 04 Mar 2021. 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Gca Legal Trustee 2016 Limited (an entity) located at Dunedin postcode 9016,
Verkerk, Lynley Joy (a director) located at Rd 3K, Oamaru postcode 9494,
Verkerk, Lucien Bernhardt (a director) located at Rd 3K, Oamaru postcode 9494. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Verkerk, Lucien Bernhardt (a director) - located at Rd 3K, Oamaru. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Verkerk, Lynley Joy, located at Rd 3K, Oamaru (a director). "Milk production - dairy cattle" (business classification A016020) is the classification the ABS issued to Verkerk Dairying Limited. Our information was last updated on 01 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
123 Vogel Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Mar 2021 |
Level 1, 123 Vogel Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & service | 13 Dec 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lynley Joy Verkerk
Rd 3k, Oamaru, 9494
Address used since 22 May 2012 |
Director | 21 May 2012 - current |
Lucien Bernhardt Verkerk
Rd 3k, Oamaru, 9494
Address used since 22 May 2012 |
Director | 21 May 2012 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
110 Vogel Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 05 Jul 2018 - 04 Mar 2021 |
Corner Vogel And Jetty Streets, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & registered | 27 Mar 2017 - 05 Jul 2018 |
Cnr Vogel & Jetty Streets, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & registered | 23 Mar 2017 - 27 Mar 2017 |
6 Shakespeare Street, Milton, Milton, 9220 | Physical | 08 Jul 2015 - 23 Mar 2017 |
6 Shakespeare Street, Milton, Milton, 9220 | Registered | 23 Jun 2014 - 23 Mar 2017 |
6 Shakespeare Street, Milton, Milton, 9220 | Physical | 21 May 2012 - 08 Jul 2015 |
6 Shakespeare Street, Milton, Milton, 9220 | Registered | 21 May 2012 - 23 Jun 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gca Legal Trustee 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042148609 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Dunedin 9016 |
22 Jun 2017 - current |
Verkerk, Lynley Joy Director |
Rd 3k Oamaru 9494 |
21 May 2012 - current |
Verkerk, Lucien Bernhardt Director |
Rd 3k Oamaru 9494 |
21 May 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Verkerk, Lucien Bernhardt Director |
Rd 3k Oamaru 9494 |
21 May 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Verkerk, Lynley Joy Director |
Rd 3k Oamaru 9494 |
21 May 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Solomons Trustees Number Two Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032986372 Company Number: 2073321 Entity |
07 Jun 2012 - 22 Jun 2017 | |
Solomons Trustees Number Two Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032986372 Company Number: 2073321 Entity |
07 Jun 2012 - 22 Jun 2017 |
Nettleton And Company Limited Cnr Vogel & Jetty Streets |
|
Cameron Wool Limited Cnr Vogel And Jetty Streets |
|
Rotary Club Of Dunedin Central Charitable Trust Board Gallaway Cook Allan |
|
Warbirds Over Wanaka Community Trust Board Gallaway Cook Allan |
|
Kuracloud Limited 77 Vogel Street |
|
Kura Research Limited 77 Vogel Street |
R W & K M Powell Limited 79 Lower Stuart Street |
Cj & Kl White Limited 139 Moray Place |
Hope Dairies Limited 139 Moray Place |
Lamb Dairy Limited L3 258 Stuart Street |
Lb Dairies Limited L3 258 Stuart Street |
Hyde Honey Company Limited Harvie Green Wyatt Chartered Accountants |