Hicks Bay Holdings Limited (issued a business number of 9429030693920) was registered on 08 May 2012. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 115 Parkes Line Road, Maymorn, Upper Hutt, 5018 (type: office, registered). Address Level 11, Aia Tower, 34-42 Manners Street, Wellington had been their service address, up until 22 Nov 2023. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Debney, Mark Andrew (an individual) located at Maymorn, Upper Hutt postcode 5018,
Wallis, David Edmund Norman (an individual) located at Wellington postcode 6011. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
115 Parkes Line Road, Maymorn, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Office | unknown |
Address Level 11, Aia Tower, 34-42 Manners Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 17 Aug 2022 |
115 Parkes Line Road, Maymorn, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Registered & service | 22 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Andrew Debney
Maymorn, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 20 Apr 2016 |
Director | 20 May 2013 - current |
Susan Elizabeth Debney
Maymorn, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 10 Feb 2022 |
Director | 10 Feb 2022 - current |
Patrick Joseph Lenihan
Waiwhetu, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 08 May 2012 |
Director | 08 May 2012 - 20 May 2013 |
115 Parkes Line Road , Maymorn , Upper Hutt , 5018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Address Level 11, Aia Tower, 34-42 Manners Street, Wellington, 6011 | Service & registered | 17 Aug 2022 - 22 Nov 2023 |
Address Level 11, Aia Tower, 34-42 Manners Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 02 May 2022 - 17 Aug 2022 |
Level 7, 49 Boulcott Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 08 May 2012 - 02 May 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Debney, Mark Andrew Individual |
Maymorn Upper Hutt 5018 |
08 May 2012 - current |
Wallis, David Edmund Norman Individual |
Wellington 6011 |
08 May 2012 - current |
Pooja Foods Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
M G Bale Trustees (hill 16) Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Sounds Lifestyle Investments Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Customs Agents Wellington Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
Ppem Nominees Limited Level 14, 1-3 Willeston Street |
|
Glading Family Trustees Limited Level 10, Greenock House, 39 The Terrace |