Independent Professionals Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429030829053) was registered on 20 Jan 2012. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: 75 Titirangi Road, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 (type: registered, service). 23 Aviemore Drive, Highland Park, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 09 Mar 2018. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Wagenaar, Russell John (an individual) located at New Lynn, Auckland postcode 0600. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Wagenaar, Emmah Margaret (an individual) - located at New Lynn, Auckland. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Independent Professionals Limited. Our information was updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
75 Titirangi Road, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 | Physical & registered & service | 09 Mar 2018 |
3b Delta Avenue, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 | Registered & service | 09 Apr 2024 |
75 Titirangi Road, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 | Registered & service | 10 May 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shakil Krishnan Naidu
New Lynn, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 01 Nov 2017 |
Director | 01 Nov 2017 - current |
Ballu Khan
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 20 Jan 2012 |
Director | 20 Jan 2012 - 01 Nov 2017 |
Shakil Naidu
New Lynn, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 13 Feb 2015 |
Director | 13 Feb 2015 - 15 Jul 2015 |
Abdul Imran Khan
Highland Park, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 12 Jun 2013 |
Director | 12 Jun 2013 - 12 Feb 2015 |
Shane Galpin
Kamo, Kamo, 0112
Address used since 20 Jan 2012 |
Director | 20 Jan 2012 - 12 Jun 2013 |
75 Titirangi Road , New Lynn , Auckland , 0600 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
23 Aviemore Drive, Highland Park, Auckland, 2010 | Physical & registered | 20 Jan 2012 - 09 Mar 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wagenaar, Russell John Individual |
New Lynn Auckland 0600 |
20 Jan 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wagenaar, Emmah Margaret Individual |
New Lynn Auckland 0600 |
20 Jan 2012 - current |
Bc394537 Limited 75 Titirangi Rd |
|
Gbcd Property Limited 75 Titirangi Rd |
|
Merahan Rs Limited 75 Titirangi Road |
|
Jec Trading Limited 75 Titirangi Road |
|
Texan Trustees Limited 75 Titirangi Road |
|
Dobson Scott Limited 75 Titirangi Road |
Lacy-hauck Trustees Limited 75 Titirangi Road |
Sunsisters Trustee Limited 1 Denyer Place |
Wang Family Investments Limited Flat 13, 47 Gardner Avenue |
Uakin Investment Trustee Limited 10a Nikau Street |
White Gardenia Trustee Company Limited 24/1 Ambrico Place |
Gould Family Trustee Company Limited Unit 24, 1 Ambrico Place |