Seaquel Products Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429030837249) was launched on 22 Dec 2011. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Unit 7A, 331 Rosedale Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (type: physical, registered). Seaquel Products Limited used other aliases, namely: Seaquel Limited from 22 Dec 2011 to 26 Jan 2012. 1000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.1% of shares), namely:
Boucher, Elaine Linda (an individual) located at Mellons Bay, Auckland postcode 2014. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 99.8% of all shares (exactly 998 shares); it includes
Boucher, Elaine Linda (an individual) - located at Mellons Bay, Auckland,
Boucher, Clinton Michael (a director) - located at Mellons Bay, Auckland. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Boucher, Clinton Michael, located at Mellons Bay, Auckland (a director). "Skin diving equipment mfg" (ANZSIC C259250) is the category the ABS issued to Seaquel Products Limited. Our information was updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 7a, 331 Rosedale Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & registered & service | 22 Dec 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Clinton Michael Boucher
Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 22 Dec 2011 |
Director | 22 Dec 2011 - current |
Kenneth Gordon Lonie
Golflands, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 22 Dec 2011 |
Director | 22 Dec 2011 - 14 Jun 2013 |
Clive Julian Waters
Mangere Bridge, Auckland, 2022
Address used since 25 Jan 2012 |
Director | 25 Jan 2012 - 14 Jun 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Boucher, Elaine Linda Individual |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 |
22 Dec 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Boucher, Elaine Linda Individual |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 |
22 Dec 2011 - current |
Boucher, Clinton Michael Director |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 |
22 Dec 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Boucher, Clinton Michael Director |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 |
22 Dec 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Waters, Clive Julian Individual |
Mangere Bridge Auckland 2022 |
22 Dec 2011 - 08 Aug 2013 |
Lonie, Kenneth Gordon Individual |
Golflands Auckland 2013 |
22 Dec 2011 - 08 Aug 2013 |
Marillier, Jennifer Merle Individual |
Golflands Auckland 2013 |
22 Dec 2011 - 08 Aug 2013 |
Kenneth Gordon Lonie Director |
Golflands Auckland 2013 |
22 Dec 2011 - 08 Aug 2013 |
Phoenix Flooring Specialists Limited Unit 7a |
|
Trade Professionals NZ Limited Unit 7a, 331 Rosedale Road |
|
Dht (2013) 5 Limited 331 Rosedale Road |
|
Workotel Limited Unit 7a |
|
Aeds New Zealand Limited Unit 7a, 331 Rosedale Road |
|
Iridium-technology Limited Unit 7a |
Sniper Spearfishing Limited 161 Settlement Road |
Scuba Equipment Servicing Limited 86 The Esplanade |
Comtec Commercial & Technical Marine Services Limited 1 Calvin Place |