Coldair Services Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429030852181) was incorporated on 13 Dec 2011. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 8 Adonis Place, Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012 (type: physical, service). 1000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 780 shares (78% of shares), namely:
Lingam, Dhan Roshni (an individual) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2019,
Lingam, Bimal Avinesh (a director) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2019. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 22% of all shares (220 shares); it includes
Martlew, Geoffrey (a director) - located at Half Moon Bay, Auckland,
D.g. Trustee Co Limited (an entity) - located at Mount Wellington, Auckland. "Air conditioning equipment installation - except motor vehicles" (business classification E323310) is the category the ABS issued to Coldair Services Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
8 Adonis Place, Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012 | Physical & service & registered | 13 Dec 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Geoffrey Martlew
Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 13 Dec 2011 |
Director | 13 Dec 2011 - current |
Bimal Avinesh Lingam
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 20 Dec 2021
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 05 Jul 2017 |
Director | 05 Jul 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lingam, Dhan Roshni Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
03 Nov 2017 - current |
Lingam, Bimal Avinesh Director |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
03 Nov 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Martlew, Geoffrey Director |
Half Moon Bay Auckland 2012 |
13 Dec 2011 - current |
D.g. Trustee Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038022333 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1072 |
13 Dec 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lingam, Bimal Avinesh Director |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
17 Jul 2017 - 17 Jul 2017 |
Lingam Enterprises Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046052162 Company Number: 6262252 Entity |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
17 Jul 2017 - 03 Nov 2017 |
Martlew, Kaylene Anne Individual |
Half Moon Bay Auckland 2012 |
13 Dec 2011 - 17 Jul 2017 |
Lingam Enterprises Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046052162 Company Number: 6262252 Entity |
17 Jul 2017 - 03 Nov 2017 |
D.y.h.2017development Limited 2 Adonis Place |
|
Grace Shui Fung Limited 3 Adonis Place |
|
New Bridge Trading Limited 4 Poseidon Place |
|
Flying Kiwi Activities Limited 1 Ganymede Place |
|
Xalta Media Limited 1 Ganymede Place |
|
Xalta Limited 1 Ganymede Place |
Air Conditioning Solutions Limited 108 Glenmore Rd |
Air Cool Limited 9 Waterloo Street |
Data Connect Limited 107 West Tamaki Road |
Airconditioning Systems Limited 1d Liston Crescent |
Kydco Technical Services Limited 43 Megan Avenue |
Rjf Industries Limited 10a De Thiery Place |