The Harpat Group Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030884939) was launched on 16 Nov 2011. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 23 Premila Drive, Pukekohe, South Auckland, 2120 (type: registered, physical). 23 Premila Drive, Pukekohe, Pukekohe had been their physical address, until 20 Nov 2020. 1000 shares are issued to 13 shareholders who belong to 6 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 1 share (0.1 per cent of shares), namely:
Surekha Hari (a director) located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe postcode 2120,
Hari, Surekha (an individual) located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe postcode 2120. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Hari, Vallabh Ravji Chhana (a director) - located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allocation (498 shares, 49.8%) belongs to 4 entities, namely:
Patel, Roshni Ravindra, located at Pakuranga Heights, Auckland (an individual),
Patel, Bhavesh Ravindra, located at Pakuranga Heights, Auckland (an individual),
Patel, Jumna Ravji Chhana, located at Pakuranga Heights, Auckland (a director). "Grocery supermarket operation" (business classification G411040) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued The Harpat Group Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 13 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
23 Premila Drive, Pukekohe, South Auckland, 2120 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Vallabh Ravji Chhana Hari
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 16 Nov 2011 |
Director | 16 Nov 2011 - current |
Jumna Ravji Chhana Patel
Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 16 Nov 2011 |
Director | 16 Nov 2011 - current |
Surekha Hari
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 16 Nov 2011 |
Director | 16 Nov 2011 - 16 Aug 2016 |
Bhavesh Ravindra Patel
Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 16 Nov 2011 |
Director | 16 Nov 2011 - 15 Aug 2016 |
23 Premila Drive , Pukekohe , Pukekohe , 2120 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
23 Premila Drive, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 | Physical | 22 Oct 2019 - 20 Nov 2020 |
Level 4, Zurich House, 21 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 20 Nov 2017 - 20 Nov 2020 |
Suite 8, 130 Dawson Road, Clover Park, Auckland, 2023 | Physical | 20 Nov 2017 - 22 Oct 2019 |
Suite 1, 16 Elliot Street, Papakura, Papakura, 2110 | Registered & physical | 04 Sep 2015 - 20 Nov 2017 |
C/o Reliance Biz Services Limited, 33a Shackleton Road, Mount Eden, 1024 | Physical & registered | 13 Aug 2012 - 04 Sep 2015 |
C/o Drk Accountants, 83b Ingram Road, Rd3 Drury, 2579 | Physical & registered | 16 Nov 2011 - 13 Aug 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Surekha Hari Director |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Hari, Surekha Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hari, Vallabh Ravji Chhana Director |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Patel, Roshni Ravindra Individual |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Patel, Bhavesh Ravindra Individual |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Patel, Jumna Ravji Chhana Director |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Bhavesh Ravindra Patel Director |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hari, Vallabh Ravji Chhana Director |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Hari, Surekha Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Surekha Hari Director |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Patel, Jumna Ravji Chhana Director |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bhavesh Ravindra Patel Director |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Patel, Bhavesh Ravindra Individual |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sturmon Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036742929 Company Number: 1167316 Entity |
Pukekohe |
16 Nov 2011 - 10 Nov 2017 |
Aviemore Trustees (2011) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031251952 Company Number: 3240833 Entity |
Highland Park Manukau 2010 |
16 Nov 2011 - 10 Nov 2017 |
Aviemore Trustees (2011) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031251952 Company Number: 3240833 Entity |
16 Nov 2011 - 10 Nov 2017 | |
Sturmon Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036742929 Company Number: 1167316 Entity |
16 Nov 2011 - 10 Nov 2017 |
Specialty Diagnostix Limited Level 4, Zurich House |
|
Windcraft New Zealand Limited Level 4, Zurich House |
|
Kids Up Front Performing Arts Academy Limited Level 4, Zurich House |
|
Tasman Machinery Pty Limited Level 4, Zurich House |
|
Cgl Morleigh Limited Level 4, Zurich House |
|
Wellpack Limited Level 4, Zurich House |
Uniti Enterprise Limited 60 Hobson Street |
Retopia Limited 103 Albert Street |
T & A Carmichael (2013) Limited 60 Roma Road |
Lianhua International Company Limited William Buck Christmas Gouwland Limited, Level 4, Zurich House, 21 Queen Street |
10 Star 11 Company Limited B1, 239 Queen Street |
Your Local Grocer Limited 18 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |