Motus Hydraulics Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429031057387) was incorporated on 29 Jun 2011. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 (type: physical, registered). Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings had been their registered address, until 13 Sep 2019. Motus Hydraulics Limited used more names, namely: Hydraulic Cylinders International Limited from 14 Jun 2011 to 12 Jul 2011. 1000 shares are issued to 8 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 127 shares (12.7% of shares), namely:
Mccallum, Diana (an individual) located at Tirohanga, Lower Hutt postcode 5010,
Mccallum, Seth Jonathan (an individual) located at Tirohanga, Lower Hutt postcode 5010. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 28.5% of all shares (285 shares); it includes
Currie, Sarah Ashley (an individual) - located at Greenmeadows, Napier,
Currie, Luke Stephen (an individual) - located at Greenmeadows, Napier. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (285 shares, 28.5%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Currie, Penelope May, located at Greenmeadows, Napier (an individual),
Currie, Hartley John, located at Greenmeadows, Napier (an individual). The Businesscheck data was last updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered & service | 13 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Luke Stephen Currie
Greenmeadows, Napier, 4112
Address used since 21 Feb 2020 |
Director | 21 Feb 2020 - current |
Jerry Mark Currie
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 21 Feb 2020 |
Director | 21 Feb 2020 - current |
Hartley John Currie
Greenmeadows, Napier, 4112
Address used since 21 Feb 2020 |
Director | 21 Feb 2020 - current |
James Robert Currie
Frimley, Hastings, 4120
Address used since 29 Jun 2011 |
Director | 29 Jun 2011 - 21 Feb 2020 |
Stephen Henry Currie
Greenmeadows, Napier, 4112
Address used since 29 Jun 2011 |
Director | 29 Jun 2011 - 25 Dec 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical | 20 Feb 2018 - 13 Sep 2019 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Physical | 24 Oct 2014 - 20 Feb 2018 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered | 29 Aug 2013 - 20 Feb 2018 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Physical | 29 Jun 2011 - 24 Oct 2014 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered | 29 Jun 2011 - 29 Aug 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mccallum, Diana Individual |
Tirohanga Lower Hutt 5010 |
12 May 2021 - current |
Mccallum, Seth Jonathan Individual |
Tirohanga Lower Hutt 5010 |
12 May 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Currie, Sarah Ashley Individual |
Greenmeadows Napier 4112 |
12 Mar 2020 - current |
Currie, Luke Stephen Individual |
Greenmeadows Napier 4112 |
31 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Currie, Penelope May Individual |
Greenmeadows Napier 4112 |
12 Mar 2020 - current |
Currie, Hartley John Individual |
Greenmeadows Napier 4112 |
31 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Currie, Jerry Mark Director |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
13 Mar 2020 - current |
Currie, Monica Grace Individual |
Havelock North 4130 |
12 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Currie, James Robert Individual |
Frimley Hastings 4120 |
29 Jun 2011 - 12 Mar 2020 |
Hsg Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031070447 Company Number: 3410632 Entity |
Hastings 4122 |
29 Jun 2011 - 12 Mar 2020 |
Currie, Stephen Henry Individual |
Greenmeadows Napier 4112 |
29 Jun 2011 - 31 Jul 2018 |
Currie, James Robert Individual |
Frimley Hastings 4120 |
29 Jun 2011 - 12 Mar 2020 |
Currie, Jerry Mark Individual |
Mahora Hastings 4120 |
31 Jul 2018 - 13 Mar 2020 |
Hsg Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031070447 Company Number: 3410632 Entity |
211 Market Street South Hastings 4122 |
29 Jun 2011 - 12 Mar 2020 |
Currie, Denise Marjorie Individual |
Greenmeadows Napier 4112 |
29 Jun 2011 - 31 Jul 2018 |
Currie, Valerie Kathryn Individual |
Frimley Hastings 4120 |
29 Jun 2011 - 12 Mar 2020 |
Black Folder Limited Building A, Level 1, Farming House |
|
Poukawa Holdings Limited 211 Market Street |
|
David Brownrigg Investments Limited Farming House |
|
Farming House Limited 211 Market Street South |
|
Kiwiwines2u Limited Building A, Level 1, Farming House |
|
Brownrigg Agriculture Limited 211 Market Street South |