Reno Art Company Limited (issued a business number of 9429031102711) was registered on 01 Jun 2011. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Unit 3, 210 Neilson Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 (type: office, delivery). 4 Malvern Road, Onehunga, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 09 Mar 2015. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Gu, Li Jun (an individual) located at Shanghai, China postcode 200052. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Ren, Li (a director) - located at West Pymble, Nsw. "Artist supplies wholesaling" (business classification F373910) is the category the ABS issued to Reno Art Company Limited. Our information was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 3, 210 Neilson Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Physical & registered & service | 09 Mar 2015 |
Unit 3, 210 Neilson Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Office & delivery | 24 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Li Ren
West Pymble, Nsw, 2073
Address used since 01 Jun 2011 |
Director | 01 Jun 2011 - current |
Li Jun Gu
Syndey, 2067
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Gordon, Nsw, 2072
Address used since 17 Aug 2012
Syndey, 2067
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 17 Aug 2012 - current |
Anthony Derek Swift
Ashfield, Nsw, 2131
Address used since 01 Jun 2011 |
Director | 01 Jun 2011 - 07 Dec 2020 |
Unit 3, 210 Neilson Street , Onehunga , Auckland , 1061 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4 Malvern Road, Onehunga, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical | 23 Aug 2012 - 09 Mar 2015 |
96a Brighton Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered | 01 Jun 2011 - 23 Aug 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gu, Li Jun Individual |
Shanghai China 200052 |
01 Jun 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ren, Li Director |
West Pymble Nsw 2073 |
01 Jun 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Swift, Anthony Derek Individual |
Ashfield Nsw 2131 |
01 Jun 2011 - 05 Sep 2022 |
Cabinetree NZ Limited 210 Neilson Street |
|
Co Sell Limited 210 Neilson Street |
|
Precision Rubber (n.z.) Limited 228 Neilson Street |
|
230 Neilson Limited 1/230b Neilson Street |
|
Evolution Civil Limited 29a Alfred Street |
|
Swinton Engineering Limited 29a Alfred Street |
Business Products New Zealand Limited 5 Airpark Drive |
Tasman Industries Limited 5 Airpark Drive |
Jasco Holdings (nz) Limited 5 Airpark Drive |
Jasco Pty (new Zealand) Limited 5 Airpark Drive |
Avalon International Limited 98 Henderson Valley Road |
Sunshine International Media And Culture Communication Co. Limited 43a Nigel Road |