Hepburn Estate Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429031108720) was started on 04 May 2011. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Ground Floor, 8 Cleveland Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: postal, delivery). Suite 1.7, 1 Cleveland Road, Parnell, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 28 Jun 2022. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Wong, Angela Kim (a director) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Wong, Christopher Shane (a director) - located at Parnell, Auckland. "Investment - residential property" (ANZSIC L671150) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Hepburn Estate Limited. Our information was last updated on 14 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Ground Floor, 8 Cleveland Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered & service | 28 Jun 2022 |
Ground Floor, 8 Cleveland Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Postal & delivery & office | 02 Dec 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Christopher Shane Wong
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 03 Nov 2012 |
Director | 04 May 2011 - current |
Angela Kim Wong
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 03 Nov 2012 |
Director | 04 May 2011 - current |
Aimee Louise Mitchell
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 17 Jun 2022 |
Director | 17 Jun 2022 - current |
Suite 1.7, 1 Cleveland Road , Parnell , Auckland , 1052 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Suite 1.7, 1 Cleveland Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical | 20 Dec 2013 - 28 Jun 2022 |
Flat A7, 1 Beresford Square, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 04 May 2011 - 20 Dec 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wong, Angela Kim Director |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
04 May 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wong, Christopher Shane Director |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
04 May 2011 - current |
Redstar Productions Limited 7/11 Cleveland Road |
|
Hnt Investments Limited 12/7 Cleveland Road |
|
Pave Group Limited Suite 1.7, 1 Cleveland Road |
|
Pave Consulting Limited Suite 1.7, 1 Cleveland Road |
|
Jane Yeh Services Limited Unit 6, 7 Cleveland Road |
|
Aladdin Holdings Limited 25/7 Cleveland Road |
Hnt Investments Limited 12/7 Cleveland Road |
Aladdin Holdings Limited 25/7 Cleveland Road |
Lucky Comfort Investments Pty Limited Flat 3, 7 Cleveland Road |
Mintaka Limited 1b, 28 Stanwell Street |
Coastal R & R Limited Suite 9, Level 2, Axis Building |
Franklin Group Limited Suite 11, 114 St Georges Bay Road |