S S Kim Limited (issued a business number of 9429031229760) was registered on 03 Feb 2011. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 7 Marsh Avenue, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 (type: postal, office). 7 Marsh Avenue, Forrest Hill, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 25 Sep 2018. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Kim, Seung Sea (an individual) located at Forrest Hill, Auckland postcode 0620. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Jeong, Bong Ae (an individual) - located at Forrest Hill, Auckland. "Restaurant operation" (ANZSIC H451130) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to S S Kim Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Marsh Avenue, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Registered | 26 Feb 2014 |
Suite 10, 62 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Physical & service | 25 Sep 2018 |
7 Marsh Avenue, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Postal & office & delivery | 28 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Seung Sea Kim
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 18 Feb 2014 |
Director | 03 Feb 2011 - current |
Bong Ae Jeong
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 17 Nov 2014 |
Director | 17 Nov 2014 - current |
Unit 2c, 20 Link Drive , Wairau Valley , Auckland , 0627 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7 Marsh Avenue, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Physical | 26 Feb 2014 - 25 Sep 2018 |
73c Nile Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 | Registered & physical | 04 Mar 2013 - 26 Feb 2014 |
26 Taharoto Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Physical & registered | 14 Feb 2012 - 04 Mar 2013 |
485 East Coast Road, Murrays Bay, North Shore City, 0630 | Registered & physical | 03 Feb 2011 - 14 Feb 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kim, Seung Sea Individual |
Forrest Hill Auckland 0620 |
03 Feb 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jeong, Bong Ae Individual |
Forrest Hill Auckland 0620 |
17 Nov 2014 - current |
Dimension Lab Surveyors & Consultants Limited 7a Marsh Avenue |
|
Lapis Properties Limited 3 Webb Place |
|
Freefall Music Newzealand Limited 6 Marsh Ave |
|
Mena Investments Limited 7 Webb Place |
|
Launch Distribute Limited 16 Webb Place |
|
Design House Limited Unit 1, 102 East Coast Road |
Talay Thai Restaurant Limited Flat 3, 140 East Coast Road |
Mantingfang Limited 12a Tobruk Crescent |
Lungdang Paneng Company Limited 42 Corunna Road |
Xy.holding Limited 88 Ravenwood Drive |
Agape Food NZ Limited 144 Kitchener Road |
Narita Japanese Restaurant Limited 3/31 Link Drive |