Mgr Trustees (Craig) Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429031313667) was started on 19 Nov 2010. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 11 Harlock Place, Huntly, Huntly, 3700 (type: shareregister, registered). 3169 Ohaupo Road, Rd 2, Hamilton had been their physical address, up to 06 Sep 2022. Mgr Trustees (Craig) Limited used more aliases, namely: Kiwitender Limited from 10 Nov 2010 to 20 Mar 2017. 120 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 120 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Rockliffe-Craig, Timon Daryl Robert (a director) located at Huntly, Huntly postcode 3700. "Investment - non financial assets nec" (ANZSIC L664010) is the category the ABS issued to Mgr Trustees (Craig) Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
3169 Ohaupo Road, Rd 2, Hamilton, 3282 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 19 Nov 2010 |
11 Harlock Place, Huntly, Huntly, 3700 | Registered & physical & service | 06 Sep 2022 |
11 Harlock Place, Huntly, Huntly, 3700 | Shareregister | 26 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Timon Daryl Robert Rockliffe-craig
Huntly, Huntly, 3700
Address used since 26 Aug 2022 |
Director | 26 Aug 2022 - current |
Maylene Gwyneth Ross
Rd 2, Hamilton, 3282
Address used since 01 Sep 2013 |
Director | 01 Sep 2013 - 26 Aug 2022 |
John Richard Southall
Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611
Address used since 19 Nov 2010 |
Director | 19 Nov 2010 - 01 Sep 2013 |
Anne Southall
Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611
Address used since 19 Nov 2010 |
Director | 19 Nov 2010 - 01 Sep 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3169 Ohaupo Road, Rd 2, Hamilton, 3282 | Physical & registered | 11 Apr 2014 - 06 Sep 2022 |
20 Broadway Road, Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611 | Registered & physical | 19 Nov 2010 - 11 Apr 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rockliffe-craig, Timon Daryl Robert Director |
Huntly Huntly 3700 |
05 Sep 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Southall, John Richard Individual |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 |
19 Nov 2010 - 31 Oct 2013 |
Ross, Maylene Gwyneth Individual |
Rd 2 Hamilton 3282 |
31 Oct 2013 - 05 Sep 2022 |
Southall, Anne Individual |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 |
19 Nov 2010 - 31 Oct 2013 |
Anne Southall Director |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 |
19 Nov 2010 - 31 Oct 2013 |
John Richard Southall Director |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 |
19 Nov 2010 - 31 Oct 2013 |
Mgr Trustee (flower) Limited 3169 Ohaupo Road |
|
Ross Builders Trustee Co. Limited 3169 Ohaupo Road |
|
Pocketmachines Limited 3169 Ohaupo Road |
|
S.k.i Investment Property Limited 3169 Ohaupo Road |
|
Ncd Trustees (sunshine) Limited 3169 Ohaupo Road |
|
M G Ross Trustee Limited 3169 Ohaupo Road |
Togiak Limited Level 3, 24 Anzac Parade |
Zephyr Franchises Limited 52 King Street |
Black House Investments Limited Chartered Accountants |
1026 Victoria Street Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
K. I. Solanki Limited 7 Wentworth Drive |
Fledgling Investment Limited 4 Arncliffe Terrace |