Eglon Investments Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429031499798) was incorporated on 24 Jun 2010. 9 addresess are currently in use by the company: 25 Hargreaves Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 (type: office, delivery). 6 Fox Street, Parnell, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 20 Nov 2020. 300 shares are allocated to 13 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 60 shares (20% of shares), namely:
Tabeale Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Milford, Auckland postcode 0620,
Beale, Nicholas Leslie (an individual) located at Auckland Cbd, Auckland postcode 1010,
Beale, Sarah Jane Blair (an individual) located at Auckland Cbd, Auckland postcode 1010. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 20% of all shares (exactly 60 shares); it includes
Hay, Julia Marie (an individual) - located at Remuera, Auckland,
Hay, Jeremy Carlton (an individual) - located at Remuera, Auckland. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (60 shares, 20%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Allen, Matthew Richard, located at Riccarton, Christchurch, Canterbury (an individual). "Car leasing, hiring or renting - except licensed hire cars or taxi cabs" (ANZSIC L661110) is the category the ABS issued to Eglon Investments Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6 Fox Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 26 Feb 2013 |
Po Box 6696, Wellesley Street, Auckland, 1141 | Postal | 27 Feb 2020 |
25 Hargreaves Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Records & other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister | 12 Nov 2020 |
25 Hargreaves Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Physical & registered & service | 20 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jeremy Carlton Hay
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 01 Oct 2017
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 28 Feb 2017 |
Director | 24 Jun 2010 - current |
David Waren Warfield
Karaka, Auckland, 2580
Address used since 31 Oct 2018 |
Director | 24 Jun 2010 - current |
Nicholas Leslie Beale
Auckland, 1010
Address used since 03 Feb 2022
Milford, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 28 Feb 2017 |
Director | 24 Jun 2010 - current |
David Warren Warfield
Dannemora, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 28 Feb 2017 |
Director | 24 Jun 2010 - current |
Matthew Richard Allen
Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011
Address used since 28 Feb 2017 |
Director | 29 Jul 2013 - current |
Cristino Ivan Monreal-oakley
Saint Marys Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 26 Feb 2018
Birkenhead, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 23 Feb 2016 |
Director | 29 Jul 2013 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
25 Hargreaves Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Physical & registered & service | 20 Nov 2020 |
25 Hargreaves Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Office & delivery | 03 Feb 2021 |
25 Hargreaves Street , Freemans Bay , Auckland , 1011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
6 Fox Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical | 06 Mar 2013 - 20 Nov 2020 |
Level 1, 5 Eglon St, Parnell, Auckland 1052 | Registered & physical | 24 Jun 2010 - 06 Mar 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tabeale Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047683945 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
27 Feb 2020 - current |
Beale, Nicholas Leslie Individual |
Auckland Cbd Auckland 1010 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Beale, Sarah Jane Blair Individual |
Auckland Cbd Auckland 1010 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hay, Julia Marie Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
28 Mar 2022 - current |
Hay, Jeremy Carlton Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Allen, Matthew Richard Individual |
Riccarton Christchurch Canterbury 8011 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stanage, Graham Martin Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Warfield, David Waren Individual |
Karaka Auckland 2580 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Warfield, Helen Maree Individual |
Karaka Auckland 2580 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Ash, Haydn Walter Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Beale, Nicholas Leslie Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Monreal-oakley, Cristino Ivan Individual |
Saint Marys Bay Auckland 1011 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Hay, Jeremy Carlton Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
31 Oct 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Allen, Matthew Richard Individual |
Riccarton Christchurch 8011 |
29 Jul 2013 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Monreal-oakley, Cristino Ivan Individual |
Saint Marys Bay Auckland 1011 |
29 Jul 2013 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Hay, Jeremy Carlton Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Hay, Jeremy Carlton Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Warfield, David Warren Individual |
Karaka Auckland 2580 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Nicholas Corporate Trustee Co. Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038260896 Company Number: 821395 Entity |
Auckland 1010 |
24 Jun 2010 - 27 Feb 2020 |
Beale, Sarah Jane Blair Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Warfield, Helen Maree Individual |
Karaka Auckland 2580 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Hay, Timothy David Individual |
Kumeu Auckland 0891 |
31 Oct 2020 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Beale, Sarah Jane Blair Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Hay, Timothy David Individual |
Rd 1 Kumeu 0891 |
12 Jul 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Beale, Sarah Jane Blair Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Beale, Nicholas Leslie Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
28 Feb 2019 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Beale, Nicholas Leslie Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Beale, Nicholas Leslie Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Beale, Nicholas Leslie Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Warfield, Helen Maree Individual |
Karaka Auckland 2580 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Ash, Haydn Walter Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
12 Jul 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Ash, Haydn Walter Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
12 Jul 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Stanage, Graham Martin Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
28 Feb 2019 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Warfield, David Warren Individual |
Karaka Auckland 2580 |
24 Jun 2010 - 31 Oct 2020 |
Nicholas Corporate Trustee Co. Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038260896 Company Number: 821395 Entity |
Auckland 1010 |
24 Jun 2010 - 27 Feb 2020 |
Donaghy, Stephen Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
24 Jun 2010 - 28 Feb 2019 |
Aquarius Corporate Trustee Limited Unit 3d, 11 Augustus Terrace |
|
International Cargo Systems Limited 11d Augustus Terrace |
|
Depreciation Consultants Limited 403/10 Fox Street |
|
Moutohora Limited 304/10 Fox Street |
|
Poppies Limited 301/15b Augustus Terrace |
|
Jasmax Group Limited 2 Marston Street |
Efn (new Zealand) Limited 8 Tangihua Street |
Drive A Sprint Car Limited Level 2, 142 Broadway |
Rental Car Holdings (nz) Limited 2 Crummer Road |
Fair Auto Rentals Limited 18 Charles Street |
Lease Solutions Limited 27b Armadale Road |
Dma Motorhome Lease Limited 17/49 Sainsbury Road |