Craig Spicer Trustee Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429031541732) was incorporated on 10 May 2010. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 5B West Fairway, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 (type: registered, physical). 125 Stapleford Crescent, Browns Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 31 May 2017. 1000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Spicer, Craig Dolan (an individual) located at Golflands, Auckland postcode 2013. Our data was updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5b West Fairway, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & physical & service | 31 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Craig Dolan Spicer
Golflands, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 13 May 2012 |
Director | 10 May 2010 - current |
Laraine Gaye Spicer
Beachlands, Auckland, 2018
Address used since 08 May 2018
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 29 Feb 2012 |
Director | 29 Feb 2012 - current |
Dennis Wayne Spicer
Beachlands, Auckland, 2018
Address used since 08 May 2018
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 29 Feb 2012 |
Director | 29 Feb 2012 - current |
Laraine Gaye Spicer
Browns Bay, North Shore City 0630,
Address used since 10 May 2010 |
Director | 10 May 2010 - 03 Jun 2010 |
Dennis Wayne Spicer
Browns Bay, North Shore City 0630,
Address used since 10 May 2010 |
Director | 10 May 2010 - 03 Jun 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
125 Stapleford Crescent, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & physical | 10 May 2010 - 31 May 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Spicer, Craig Dolan Individual |
Golflands Auckland 2013 |
10 May 2010 - current |
Rmj Consulting Limited 1/39 West Fairway |
|
Andrewcs Limited 6 The Green |
|
City Cafe Limited 1/8 The Green |
|
Whanau Health Limited 8 West Fairway |
|
S L K Investments Limited 63 Golflands Drive |