Grace Trading (2010) Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429031549318) was launched on 12 May 2010. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 74A Beach Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 (type: office, physical). Unit 16B, 9 Laidlaw Way, East Tamaki, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 11 Mar 2016. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Burger, Joy (an individual) located at Mellons Bay, Auckland postcode 2014. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Burger, Louis Matthew (an individual) - located at Mellons Bay, Auckland. "Electrical services" (business classification E323220) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Grace Trading (2010) Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
74a Beach Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 | Office | unknown |
Unit 6a, 9 Laidlaw Way, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2019 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 03 Mar 2016 |
Unit 6a, 9 Laidlaw Way, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2019 | Physical & registered & service | 11 Mar 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Louis Matthew Burger
Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 28 Feb 2013 |
Director | 12 May 2010 - current |
Joy Burger
Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 28 Feb 2013 |
Director | 12 May 2010 - current |
74a Beach Road , Mellons Bay , Auckland , 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 16b, 9 Laidlaw Way, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2016 | Registered & physical | 31 Mar 2014 - 11 Mar 2016 |
2g Amera Place, Huntington Park, East Tamaki, Auckland | Physical & registered | 12 May 2010 - 31 Mar 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burger, Joy Individual |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 |
12 May 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burger, Louis Matthew Individual |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 |
12 May 2010 - current |
Skimit Limited Unit 16b, 9 Laidlaw Way |
|
Blue Heron Investments Limited Unit 10a, 9 Laidlaw Way |
|
Chemwat Incorporated Limited 9 Laidlaw Way |
|
Q E S Trust Unit 5b |
|
Pick Pack Go Limited Unit 5a, 9 Laidlaw Way |
|
Santec Limited Unit 6a, 9 Laidlaw Way |
South Auckland Electrical Limited 6/8 Laidlaw Way |
Master Equipment Limited 26 Birmingham Road |
Net Zero Energy Solutions Limited Suite 3, 277 Te Irirangi Drive |
Your Electrical Solutions Limited Suite 3, 277 Te Irirangi Drive |
Industrial Electrics Limited 1 Ambrose Lane |
Aims Electrical Limited 12j Andromeda Crescent |