Corston Holdings Limited (NZBN 9429031578509) was registered on 27 Apr 2010. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 12 Avon Gate, Russley, Christchurch, 8042 (type: physical, registered). Level 4, 7 Winston Avenue, Papanui, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 04 Mar 2019. 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (1% of shares), namely:
Corston, Anthony Francis (an individual) located at Redcliffs, Christchurch 8081. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Corston, Catherine Mary (an individual) - located at Redcliffs, Christchurch 8081. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (98 shares, 98%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Corston, Catherine Mary, located at Redcliffs, Christchurch 8081 (an individual),
Robinson, Lee Michael Christopher, located at Christchurch 8140 (an individual),
Corston, Anthony Francis, located at Redcliffs, Christchurch 8081 (an individual). Our information was updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
12 Avon Gate, Russley, Christchurch, 8042 | Physical & registered & service | 04 Mar 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Anthony Francis Corston
Redcliffs, Christchurch 8081,
Address used since 27 Apr 2010 |
Director | 27 Apr 2010 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 7 Winston Avenue, Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical & registered | 03 Dec 2018 - 04 Mar 2019 |
Unit 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered | 27 Apr 2010 - 03 Dec 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Corston, Anthony Francis Individual |
Redcliffs Christchurch 8081 |
27 Apr 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Corston, Catherine Mary Individual |
Redcliffs Christchurch 8081 |
27 Apr 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Corston, Catherine Mary Individual |
Redcliffs Christchurch 8081 |
27 Apr 2010 - current |
Robinson, Lee Michael Christopher Individual |
Christchurch 8140 |
27 Apr 2010 - current |
Corston, Anthony Francis Individual |
Redcliffs Christchurch 8081 |
27 Apr 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gray, Colin Stuart Individual |
25 Churchill Street Christchurch 8013 |
27 Apr 2010 - 07 May 2019 |
Designa Electronics Limited Unit 5, Amuri Park, 404 Barbadoes Street |
|
Boulding Technology Limited 404 Barbadoes Street |
|
Pipiot Limited Unit 5, Amuri Park |
|
Spore Lab Limited 5 Amuri Park, 404 Barbadoes St |
|
Fabric House Limited Unit 5, 404 Barbadoes Street |
|
Tape Replacement Limited Unit 5, 404 Barbadoes Street |