Walch Am Limited (issued a business number of 9429031612258) was registered on 19 Mar 2010. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 9Th Floor, 45 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, registered). 9Th Floor, 45 Queen Street, Auckland had been their physical address, until 07 Jun 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 12 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 5 entities and holds 1 share (1% of shares), namely:
Earl, Anne (an individual) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052,
Guise, Anne Elizabeth (an individual) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052,
Guise, Peter Boyd (a director) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052. In the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 11% of all shares (exactly 11 shares); it includes
Earl, Anne (an individual) - located at Parnell, Auckland,
Guise, Anne Elizabeth (an individual) - located at Parnell, Auckland,
Guise, Peter Boyd (a director) - located at Parnell, Auckland. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (26 shares, 26%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Chapman, James Murdoch, located at Rd 2, Mercer (a director),
Inglin, Thada-Anne, located at 9Th Floor, 45 Queen Street, Auckland (an individual). Businesscheck's information was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
9th Floor, 45 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 07 Jun 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
James Murdoch Chapman
Rd 2, Mercer, 2474
Address used since 08 Oct 2013 |
Director | 19 Mar 2010 - current |
Kenneth Allan Walsh
Cambridge, 3434
Address used since 01 Jul 2011 |
Director | 19 Mar 2010 - current |
Peter Boyd Guise
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 15 Jan 2014 |
Director | 19 Mar 2010 - current |
Bounlarn Khamwanthong
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 11 Mar 2020 |
Director | 11 Mar 2020 - current |
Robert Anthony Boniface
Northcote, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 18 Jun 2012 |
Director | 18 Jun 2012 - 09 May 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
9th Floor, 45 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 23 Jan 2014 - 07 Jun 2019 |
9th Floor, Tower Centre, 45 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 11 Jul 2011 - 23 Jan 2014 |
Staples Rodway Ltd, 9th Floor, Tower Centre, 45 Queen Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 19 Mar 2010 - 11 Jul 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Earl, Anne Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
03 Jul 2023 - current |
Guise, Anne Elizabeth Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
03 Jul 2023 - current |
Guise, Peter Boyd Director |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
03 Jul 2023 - current |
Inglin, Thada-anne Individual |
9th Floor 45 Queen Street, Auckland 1010 |
19 Mar 2010 - current |
Chapman, James Murdoch Director |
Rd 2 Mercer 2474 |
28 Mar 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Earl, Anne Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
03 Jul 2023 - current |
Guise, Anne Elizabeth Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
03 Jul 2023 - current |
Guise, Peter Boyd Director |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
03 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapman, James Murdoch Director |
Rd 2 Mercer 2474 |
28 Mar 2019 - current |
Inglin, Thada-anne Individual |
9th Floor 45 Queen Street, Auckland 1010 |
19 Mar 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Agq Shares Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047566668 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mangere Auckland 2022 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walsh Motors Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040148496 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
(victoria Road) Cambridge |
19 Mar 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tanus Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038051999 Company Number: 864583 Entity |
45 Queen Street Auckland 1010 |
19 Mar 2010 - 03 Jul 2023 |
Chapman, Jamieson Lindsay Individual |
9th Floor, Tower Centre 45 Queen Street, Auckland |
19 Mar 2010 - 06 Sep 2010 |
Tanus Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038051999 Company Number: 864583 Entity |
45 Queen Street Auckland 1010 |
19 Mar 2010 - 03 Jul 2023 |
Guise, Peter Boyd Individual |
9th Floor 45 Queen Street, Auckland 1010 |
19 Mar 2010 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Chapman, James Murdoch Individual |
9th Floor, Tower Centre 45 Queen Street, Auckland |
19 Mar 2010 - 06 Sep 2010 |
Chapman, Catherine Margaret Individual |
9th Floor, Tower Centre 45 Queen Street, Auckland |
19 Mar 2010 - 06 Sep 2010 |
Nick & Jane Investment Trust Limited 9th Floor |
|
New Zealand Carbon Farming (gisborne) Limited 9th Floor |
|
Winston 16 Trustee Limited 9th Floor |
|
Ag Mangapapa Investment Limited 9th Floor |
|
New Zealand Forest Leasing Limited 9th Floor |
|
E & Fm Grooten Trustee Limited 9th Floor |