Forsi Rights Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429031643757) was launched on 30 Mar 2010. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 14 Tui Street, Matamata, 3400 (type: registered, physical). C/-Harris & Co, 14 Tui Street, Matamata had been their registered address, up to 30 Aug 2011. Forsi Rights Limited used other names, namely: Filter-Pro Rights Limited from 30 Mar 2010 to 13 May 2010. 61000 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 610 shares (1% of shares), namely:
Hawes, Sylvia Marilyn (an individual) located at Matamata 3400. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 98% of all shares (exactly 59780 shares); it includes
Harris Co Trustees Limited (an entity) - located at 14 Tui Street, Matamata,
Hawes, Sylvia Marilyn (an individual) - located at Matamata 3400,
Hawes, Colin Terrence (an individual) - located at Matamata 3400. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (610 shares, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Hawes, Colin Terrence, located at Matamata 3400 (an individual). The Businesscheck data was updated on 29 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
14 Tui Street, Matamata, 3400 | Service & physical | 02 Mar 2011 |
14 Tui Street, Matamata, 3400 | Registered | 30 Aug 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Colin Terrence Hawes
Matamata, 3400
Address used since 26 Aug 2015 |
Director | 30 Mar 2010 - current |
Sylvia Marilyn Hawes
Matamata, 3400
Address used since 26 Aug 2015 |
Director | 30 Mar 2010 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-harris & Co, 14 Tui Street, Matamata, 3400 | Registered | 02 Mar 2011 - 30 Aug 2011 |
C/-harris & Co, 14 Tui Street, Matamata 3400 | Registered & physical | 30 Mar 2010 - 02 Mar 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hawes, Sylvia Marilyn Individual |
Matamata 3400 |
30 Mar 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris Co Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035969679 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
14 Tui Street Matamata 3400 |
30 Mar 2010 - current |
Hawes, Sylvia Marilyn Individual |
Matamata 3400 |
30 Mar 2010 - current |
Hawes, Colin Terrence Individual |
Matamata 3400 |
30 Mar 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hawes, Colin Terrence Individual |
Matamata 3400 |
30 Mar 2010 - current |
Mcfarlane Innovations Limited 14 Tui Street |
|
Oxford Thoroughbreds Limited 14 Tui Street |
|
Willow-glen Goats Ii Limited 14 Tui Street |
|
B & C Anderton Limited 14 Tui Street |
|
Chittick Investments Limited 14 Tui Street |
|
Harris Begovich Livestock Limited 14 Tui Street |