Mokohinau Trustees Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429031718431) was registered on 18 Dec 2009. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 33 Selwyn Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 (type: physical, registered). 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Doglaw Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Onehunga, Auckland. Our information was updated on 20 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
33 Selwyn Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Physical & registered & service | 18 Dec 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Brendan Timothy Wood
Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677
Address used since 01 Sep 2016
Rd 2, Onewhero, 2697
Address used since 03 Aug 2018 |
Director | 05 Aug 2015 - current |
Tara Wratten
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 01 Sep 2016 |
Director | 05 Aug 2015 - current |
David Kevin Gray
One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 05 Dec 2018 |
Director | 05 Dec 2018 - current |
Bronwyn Ann Hantz
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 04 Mar 2021
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 25 Nov 2019 |
Director | 25 Nov 2019 - current |
Peter Andrew Oliver
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 01 Sep 2016 |
Director | 18 Dec 2009 - 14 Jun 2024 |
Timothy John Goulding
Rd 1, Amberley, 7481
Address used since 03 Aug 2018
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 21 Aug 2017
Rd 7, Rangiora, 7477
Address used since 01 Sep 2016 |
Director | 18 Dec 2009 - 04 Mar 2021 |
Guy Patrick Newlove
Clarks Beach, Clarks Beach, 2122
Address used since 01 Sep 2016 |
Director | 18 Dec 2009 - 01 Aug 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Doglaw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032137835 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Onehunga Auckland |
18 Dec 2009 - current |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Doglaw Trustees Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 2283106 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Hoddle Trustee Company Limited 33 Selwyn Street |
|
Spring And Autumn Trustees Limited 33 Selwyn Street |
|
Carian Trustee Company Limited 33 Selwyn Street |
|
M & M Waters Trustee Company Limited 33 Selwyn Street |
|
Dkl Trustees No1 Limited 33 Selwyn Street |
|
Philorth Trustees Limited 33 Selwyn Street |