Methven Medical Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031725453) was registered on 11 Jan 2010. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 4 Methven Chertsey Road, Methven, Methven, 7730 (type: delivery, postal). 100 Burnett Street, Ashburton had been their registered address, up to 20 Mar 2017. 36000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 9000 shares (25% of shares), namely:
Hellyer, Kathryn (an individual) located at Rd 2, Ashburton postcode 7772. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25% of all shares (9000 shares); it includes
Hellyer, Nathan Craig (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Ashburton. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (9000 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
O'duffy, Gayle Peta, located at Methven 7730 (an individual). "Clinic - medical - general practice" (ANZSIC Q851110) is the classification the ABS issued to Methven Medical Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
54 Cass Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Mar 2017 |
4 Methven Chertsey Road, Methven, Methven, 7730 | Delivery & postal & office | 21 May 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gayle Peta O'duffy
Methven, 7730
Address used since 03 Jul 2015 |
Director | 11 Jan 2010 - current |
Kathryn Hellyer
Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772
Address used since 01 Jan 2018 |
Director | 01 Jan 2018 - current |
Cheryl Tallon
Methven, Methven, 7730
Address used since 02 Feb 2024
Methven, 7730
Address used since 01 Oct 2020 |
Director | 01 Oct 2020 - current |
Steven Marshall Bannister
Methven, Methven, 7730
Address used since 12 Oct 2011
Methven, Methven, 7730
Address used since 30 Apr 2020 |
Director | 12 Oct 2011 - 02 Feb 2024 |
Sophie Febery
Methven, Methven, 7730
Address used since 01 Jan 2018 |
Director | 01 Jan 2018 - 15 Dec 2023 |
John Francis Mcgettigan
Methven, 7730
Address used since 28 May 2015 |
Director | 11 Jan 2010 - 01 Jan 2018 |
4 Methven Chertsey Road , Methven , Methven , 7730 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
100 Burnett Street, Ashburton | Registered & physical | 11 Jan 2010 - 20 Mar 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hellyer, Kathryn Individual |
Rd 2 Ashburton 7772 |
18 Apr 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hellyer, Nathan Craig Individual |
Rd 2 Ashburton 7772 |
02 Feb 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'duffy, Gayle Peta Individual |
Methven 7730 |
11 Jan 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'duffy, John Gerard Individual |
Methven 7730 |
11 Jan 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'duffy, Gayle Peta Individual |
Methven 7730 |
11 Jan 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tallon, Cheryl Individual |
Methven Methven 7730 |
20 May 2021 - 12 Aug 2024 |
Tallon, Cheryl Individual |
Methven Methven 7730 |
20 May 2021 - 12 Aug 2024 |
B.o.m.b Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050882779 Company Number: 8490455 Entity |
30 Jul 2024 - 12 Aug 2024 | |
Cheryl Tallon & Mark James Tallon Other |
Methven Methven 7730 |
02 Feb 2024 - 30 Jul 2024 |
Cheryl Tallon & Mark James Tallon Other |
Methven Methven 7730 |
02 Feb 2024 - 30 Jul 2024 |
Febery, Sophie Individual |
Methven Methven 7730 |
18 Apr 2018 - 02 Feb 2024 |
Bannister, Steven Marshall Individual |
Methven Methven 7730 |
12 Apr 2011 - 03 Feb 2024 |
Bannister, Steven Marshall Individual |
Methven Methven 7730 |
12 Apr 2011 - 03 Feb 2024 |
Sophie Febery Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030054523 Company Number: 4658805 Entity |
Mataura 9712 |
18 Apr 2018 - 02 Feb 2024 |
Febery, Sophie Individual |
Methven Methven 7730 |
18 Apr 2018 - 02 Feb 2024 |
Febery, Sophie Individual |
Methven Methven 7730 |
18 Apr 2018 - 02 Feb 2024 |
Methven Medical Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037342968 Company Number: 1019205 Entity |
Ashburton 7700 |
11 Jan 2010 - 18 Apr 2018 |
Methven Medical Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037342968 Company Number: 1019205 Entity |
Ashburton 7700 |
11 Jan 2010 - 18 Apr 2018 |
Mcgettigan, Kathleen Mary Individual |
Methven 7730 |
11 Jan 2010 - 10 Apr 2015 |
Mcgettigan, John Francis Individual |
Methven 7730 |
11 Jan 2010 - 18 Apr 2018 |
Ashburton Guardian Company Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
Kiwicorp Products Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
Chris Woods Contracting Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
A & J Lowe Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
Rudge Holdings Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
V P Farming Limited 54 Cass Street |
Methven Medical Services Limited 54 Cass Street |
Workplace Health Partners Limited 234 Havelock Street |
Rolleston Central Health Limited 9 Masefield Drive |
Tarahaoa Health Limited 39 George Street |
Point Ii Care (2014) Limited 2nd Floor 18 Woollcombe Street |
Dumaine Services Limited 18 The Mews |