Moneyworks Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429031744089) was started on 14 Dec 2009. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 7C Hall Street, Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434 (type: registered, physical). 19 Queen Street, Cambridge, Cambridge had been their registered address, up to 31 Jan 2017. 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1 share (1% of shares), namely:
Church, Carey Robyn (an individual) located at Cambridge, Cambridge postcode 3434. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Church, Peter Alan (an individual) - located at Cambridge, Cambridge. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (98 shares, 98%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Church, Peter Alan, located at Cambridge, Cambridge (an individual),
Church, Carey Robyn, located at Cambridge, Cambridge (an individual),
Hughes, Gordon Athol, located at Tindalls Beach, Whangaparaoa (an individual). The Businesscheck database was last updated on 14 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7c Hall Street, Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434 | Registered & physical & service | 31 Jan 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Carey Robyn Church
Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434
Address used since 23 Jan 2017 |
Director | 14 Dec 2009 - current |
7c Hall Street , Cambridge , Cambridge , 3434 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
19 Queen Street, Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434 | Registered & physical | 16 Jun 2015 - 31 Jan 2017 |
23 Noni Street, Turangi, 3353 | Registered & physical | 27 Apr 2011 - 16 Jun 2015 |
C/-strettons Ltd, 44 Heuheu Street, Taupo | Registered & physical | 14 Dec 2009 - 27 Apr 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Church, Carey Robyn Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
14 Dec 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Church, Peter Alan Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
14 Dec 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Church, Peter Alan Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
14 Dec 2009 - current |
Church, Carey Robyn Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
14 Dec 2009 - current |
Hughes, Gordon Athol Individual |
Tindalls Beach Whangaparaoa 0930 |
14 Dec 2009 - current |
Moneyworks Investment Limited 7c Hall Street |
|
Moneyworks NZ Limited 7c Hall Street |
|
Aspect Properties Limited 12 Grey Street |
|
Huckstead Limited 12 Grey Street |
|
De Laval Investments Limited 31 Queen Street |
|
Azzmax Limited 31 Queen Street |