Wylie Mcdonald Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429031770286) was registered on 12 Nov 2009. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Level 8, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, service). Floor 8, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 29 Sep 2021. Wylie Mcdonald Limited used more aliases, namely: Hlb Wylie Mcdonald Limited from 19 Jan 2010 to 20 Jan 2010, Hlb Mann Judd Limited (12 Nov 2009 to 19 Jan 2010). 1 share is allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Wylie Mcdonald Trustee Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Grafton, Auckland postcode 1010. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the classification the ABS issued Wylie Mcdonald Limited. Our information was last updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Po Box 43, Shortland Street, Auckland, 1140 | Postal | 13 May 2019 |
Floor 6, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Office & delivery | 28 May 2020 |
Level 8, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 29 Sep 2021 |
Level 8, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service | 18 Oct 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Peter Hoy
Rd 2, Helensville, 0875
Address used since 13 Apr 2022 |
Director | 13 Apr 2022 - current |
Philip Vincent Judge
Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 01 Feb 2022
Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 24 Nov 2021
Rothesay Bay, North Shore City, 0630
Address used since 04 May 2010 |
Director | 12 Nov 2009 - 13 Apr 2022 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 8, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service | 18 Oct 2021 |
Floor 6, 57 Symonds Street , Grafton , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Floor 8, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 30 Jul 2021 - 29 Sep 2021 |
Floor 8, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 30 Jul 2021 - 18 Oct 2021 |
Floor 6, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 08 Jun 2020 - 30 Jul 2021 |
Level 6, 57 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 12 Nov 2009 - 08 Jun 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wylie Mcdonald Trustee Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047614246 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Grafton Auckland 1010 |
19 Apr 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Judge, Philip Vincent Individual |
Rothesay Bay North Shore City 0630 |
12 Nov 2009 - 19 Apr 2021 |
J A Davey Limited Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Road |
|
Aquaknight Industries Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds Street |
|
Mr White Limited Level 2, 60 Grafton Road |
|
Mjic Limited Level 2, 60 Grafton Road |
|
Cj Cafe Limited Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Rd |
|
Country Treasures Limited Level 2, 3 Arawa Street |
Keay Trustee Company Limited Level 2, 71 Symonds St |
Hannan Trustee Company Limited Level 2, 71 Symonds St |
Gaze Burt Trustees 13 Limited Level 5, 57 Symonds Street |
Hastie Trustee Company Limited Level 2, 71 Symonds St |
Trustee Corporation (hen170) Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds Street |
Trustee Corporation (no. 4) Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds Street |