D G Engineering Enterprises Limited (issued a business number of 9429031784122) was registered on 06 Nov 2009. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 5 Wantwood Grove, Churton Park, Wellington, 6037 (type: registered, physical). 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 25 shares (25 per cent of shares), namely:
Salisbury, Graham Victor (an individual) located at Churton Park, Wellington. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25 per cent of all shares (exactly 25 shares); it includes
Salisbury, Elizabeth Regina (an individual) - located at Churton Park, Wellington. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (50 shares, 50%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Green, Karen Kathleen, located at Tawa, Wellington (an individual). "Metal container mfg" (ANZSIC C223950) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued D G Engineering Enterprises Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5 Wantwood Grove, Churton Park, Wellington, 6037 | Registered & physical & service | 06 Nov 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Graham Victor Salisbury
Churton Park, Wellington, 6037
Address used since 03 Sep 2015 |
Director | 06 Nov 2009 - current |
Karen Kathleen Green
Tawa, Wellington, 5028
Address used since 04 Sep 2012 |
Director | 06 Nov 2009 - current |
Elizabeth Regina Salisbury
Churton Park, Wellington, 6037
Address used since 03 Sep 2015 |
Director | 06 Nov 2009 - current |
David Allan Green
Newlands, Wellington,
Address used since 06 Nov 2009 |
Director | 06 Nov 2009 - 07 Sep 2011 |
5 Wantwood Grove , Churton Park , Wellington , 6037 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Salisbury, Graham Victor Individual |
Churton Park Wellington |
06 Nov 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Salisbury, Elizabeth Regina Individual |
Churton Park Wellington |
06 Nov 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Green, Karen Kathleen Individual |
Tawa Wellington 5028 |
06 Nov 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Green, David Allan Individual |
Tawa Wellington 5028 |
06 Nov 2009 - 09 Mar 2015 |
Zampelles Coffee & Honey Company Limited 5 Wantwood Grove |
|
Parlay Limited 5 Wantwood Grove |
|
Amy James Limited 5 Wantwood Grove |
|
Nnk Holdings Limited 12 Wantwood Grove |
|
Mitchell Ryan Investments Limited 12 Burbank Crescent |
|
Ryan Mitchell Consulting Limited 12 Burbank Crescent |
Cable Ways Limited 12 Lansford Crescent |