Driving Simulators Nz Limited (issued a business number of 9429031818735) was incorporated on 24 Mar 2004. 14 addresess are currently in use by the company: 5 Wigan Place, Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410 (type: postal, office). 9 Linmor Place, Terrace End, Palmerston North had been their registered address, up to 18 Feb 2020. Driving Simulators Nz Limited used other names, namely: Grefam Investments Limited from 24 Mar 2004 to 01 Jun 2010. 1200 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 600 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Green, Susan Wendy (an individual) located at Hokowhitu, Palmerston North postcode 4410. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (600 shares); it includes
Green, Tony Mark (an individual) - located at Hokowhitu, Palmerston North. "Flight or driving simulator operation - mainly amusement" (business classification R913125) is the classification the ABS issued Driving Simulators Nz Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
9 Linmor Place, Terrace End, Palmerston North, 4410 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 06 Feb 2017 |
11 Ruapehu Drive, Fitzherbert, Palmerston North, 4410 | Office & postal & delivery & shareregister & other (Address For Share Register) | 08 Feb 2020 |
11 Ruapehu Drive, Terrace End, Palmerston North, 4410 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Feb 2020 |
5 Wigan Place, Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410 | Shareregister | 28 Apr 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Tony Mark Green
Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 01 Jun 2023
Fitzherbert, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 08 Feb 2020
Terrace End, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 06 Feb 2017 |
Director | 24 Mar 2004 - current |
Susan Wendy Green
Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 01 Jun 2023
Fitzherbert, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 08 Feb 2020
Terrace End, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 06 Feb 2017 |
Director | 24 Mar 2004 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
5 Wigan Place, Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410 | Shareregister | 28 Apr 2023 |
5 Wigan Place, Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410 | Service | 08 May 2023 |
5 Wigan Place, Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410 | Registered | 12 May 2023 |
5 Wigan Place, Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410 | Postal & office & delivery | 27 Feb 2024 |
11 Ruapehu Drive , Fitzherbert , Palmerston North , 4410 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
9 Linmor Place, Terrace End, Palmerston North, 4410 | Registered & physical | 15 Feb 2017 - 18 Feb 2020 |
147 Maidstone Road, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 | Registered & physical | 22 Mar 2013 - 15 Feb 2017 |
2 Dunbarton Street, Redwood, Christchurch 8005 | Physical & registered | 24 Mar 2004 - 22 Mar 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Green, Susan Wendy Individual |
Hokowhitu Palmerston North 4410 |
24 Mar 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Green, Tony Mark Individual |
Hokowhitu Palmerston North 4410 |
24 Mar 2004 - current |
Crossman Group Limited 4 Silverdale Court |
|
Campbell Design NZ Limited 12 Linmor Place |
|
Nikau Street Hall Assembly Trust 6 Linmore Place |
|
Kelvin Grove Community Association Incorporated 15 Linmor Place |
|
Scend Limited 393 Ruahine Street |
|
Caniry Glister Limited 4 Salisbury Avenue |
Funzone Rotorua Limited 2 Crummer Road |
Sik N Loud Limited 6 Blake Street |
Pacific Simulators 2010 Limited 11 Vanadium Place |
Hoss Limited 2nd Floor |
Drive Yourself Limited 105 John F Kennedy Drive |
Carnz Training Limited 104 Boness Road |