Bolina Foods Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429031927321) was registered on 18 Sep 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 39 George Street, Timaru, 7910 (type: physical, registered). 36 Gleniti Road, Timaru had been their physical address, up to 29 Sep 2015. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 10 shares (10 per cent of shares), namely:
Singh, Avtar (a director) located at Gleniti, Timaru postcode 7910. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 80 per cent of all shares (exactly 80 shares); it includes
Su, Fesili (an individual) - located at Gleniti, Timaru. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (10 shares, 10%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Bolina, Sukhwinder, located at Gleniti, Timaru (an individual). Our database was updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
39 George Street, Timaru, 7910 | Physical & registered & service | 29 Sep 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Avtar Singh Bolina
Timaru, Timaru, 7910
Address used since 09 Nov 2016 |
Director | 18 Sep 2009 - current |
Avtar Singh
Gleniti, Timaru, 7910
Address used since 19 Sep 2017 |
Director | 18 Sep 2009 - current |
Fesili Su
Gleniti, Timaru, 7910
Address used since 19 Sep 2017
Timaru, Timaru, 7910
Address used since 09 Nov 2016 |
Director | 26 Mar 2010 - current |
Garjinder Singh Bolina
Timaru,
Address used since 18 Sep 2009 |
Director | 18 Sep 2009 - 26 Mar 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
36 Gleniti Road, Timaru | Physical & registered | 18 Sep 2009 - 29 Sep 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Singh, Avtar Director |
Gleniti Timaru 7910 |
21 Sep 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Su, Fesili Individual |
Gleniti Timaru 7910 |
31 Mar 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bolina, Sukhwinder Individual |
Gleniti Timaru 7910 |
17 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bolina, Avtar Singh Individual |
Gleniti Timaru 7910 |
18 Sep 2009 - 21 Sep 2017 |
Bolina, Garjinder Singh Individual |
Timaru |
18 Sep 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Piccolo Bambino Limited 39 George Street |
|
Wurmitzer Surgical Limited 39 George Street |
|
Heigold Motors Limited 39 George Street |
|
Silver Star Designs Limited 39 George Street |
|
Gladstone Bar Limited 39 George Street |
|
Mcintosh Catering Limited 39 George Street |