Allom Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429031942362) was registered on 24 Apr 1963. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 11 Allom Lane, Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 (type: registered, service). Unit 12, 337 Harewood Road, Bishopdale, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 11 Apr 2019. Allom Holdings Limited used other names, namely: South City Pharmacy Limited from 24 Apr 1963 to 04 Nov 2013. 20000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 18000 shares (90 per cent of shares), namely:
Wood, Bruce Edmund (an individual) located at Christchurch. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 10 per cent of all shares (exactly 2000 shares); it includes
Wood, Barbara Ann (an individual) - located at Christchurch. The Businesscheck data was updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 6 6 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical & service & registered | 11 Apr 2019 |
11 Allom Lane, Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 | Registered & service | 03 Apr 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce Edmund Wood
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 31 Mar 2016 |
Director | 04 Jul 1990 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 12, 337 Harewood Road, Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered & physical | 01 Apr 2015 - 11 Apr 2019 |
Level 1 388 Riccarton Road, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8440 | Physical & registered | 31 May 2012 - 01 Apr 2015 |
Level 1, 122 Riccarton Road, Riccarton, Christchurch 8440 | Physical | 30 Mar 2010 - 31 May 2012 |
Level 1 122 Riccarton Road, Riccarton, Christchurch 8440 | Registered | 30 Mar 2010 - 31 May 2012 |
Deloitte, Level 4, 32 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Registered | 13 Feb 2004 - 30 Mar 2010 |
555 Colombo Street, Christchurch | Physical | 06 Aug 1996 - 30 Mar 2010 |
C/o Deloitte Haskins & Sells, Level 4, 32 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Registered | 06 Aug 1996 - 13 Feb 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wood, Bruce Edmund Individual |
Christchurch |
24 Apr 1963 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wood, Barbara Ann Individual |
Christchurch |
24 Apr 1963 - current |
Tpms (2010) Limited 4/337 Harewood Road |
|
Feutz & Goldsmith Builders (2008) Limited Unit 2 337 Harewood Road |
|
A R Were Dental Limited 8/337 Harewood Road |
|
Wholesale 4wd Limited Unit 10, 333 Harewood Road |
|
Yaw NZ Limited 10/333 Harewood Road |
|
Cust Investments Limited Unit 10, 333 Harewood Road |