Tmc Group Limited (NZBN 9429032097184) was incorporated on 11 Aug 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (type: registered, physical). Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road, Northcote, Christchurch had been their physical address, up until 13 Apr 2022. 112 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.89 per cent of shares), namely:
Lamberth, Marie Anne (an individual) located at Poraiti, Napier postcode 4112. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 42.86 per cent of all shares (exactly 48 shares); it includes
Dk Alexander Trustee 2010 Limited (an entity) - located at Mount Pleasant, Christchurch,
Lamberth, Marie Anne (an individual) - located at Poraiti, Napier,
Mcloughlin, Todd Robert (an individual) - located at Poraiti, Napier. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (12 shares, 10.71%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Mcloughlin, Todd Robert, located at Poraiti, Napier (an individual). Our information was updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Apr 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Todd Robert Mcloughlin
Poraiti, Napier, 4112
Address used since 09 Feb 2024
Poraiti, Napier, 4112
Address used since 28 Feb 2022
Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 01 Feb 2013 |
Director | 11 Aug 2009 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road, Northcote, Christchurch, 8052 | Physical & registered | 07 Mar 2018 - 13 Apr 2022 |
41a Sawyers Arms Road, Northcote, Christchurch, 8052 | Registered & physical | 07 Mar 2013 - 07 Mar 2018 |
C/-dk Alexander, 154 Tuam Street, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 19 Oct 2010 - 07 Mar 2013 |
C/-morrison Creed, 52 Victoria Avenue, Palmerston North | Physical & registered | 11 Aug 2009 - 19 Oct 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lamberth, Marie Anne Individual |
Poraiti Napier 4112 |
11 Aug 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dk Alexander Trustee 2010 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031512374 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mount Pleasant Christchurch 8081 |
26 Aug 2010 - current |
Lamberth, Marie Anne Individual |
Poraiti Napier 4112 |
11 Aug 2009 - current |
Mcloughlin, Todd Robert Individual |
Poraiti Napier 4112 |
11 Aug 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcloughlin, Todd Robert Individual |
Poraiti Napier 4112 |
11 Aug 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcloughlin, Todd Robert Individual |
Poraiti Napier 4112 |
11 Aug 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morrison Creed Trustee 2010 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032319644 Company Number: 2225776 Entity |
11 Aug 2009 - 26 Aug 2010 | |
Morrison Creed Trustee 2010 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032319644 Company Number: 2225776 Entity |
11 Aug 2009 - 26 Aug 2010 |
Zrk Limited Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road |
|
Ashgrove Holdings Chch Limited Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road |
|
South Beach Forest Land Limited Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road |
|
Tasman Holdings (chch) Limited Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road |
|
Greatplains Property Lunns Limited Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road |
|
Alexander Holdings Limited 41a Sawyers Arms Road |